SANCHEZ v. KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: OSCAR SANCHEZ
Defendant: KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC. and KOHL'S CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv10840
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Letter request to stay the pending motion filed at D.E.4 is granted. The Court will administratively terminate the motion. Counsel are to file a letter on the court docket seeking reinstatement should settlement negotiations fail. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/23/2020. (bt, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Plaintiff and Defendants Requesting Stay. (CASSORLA, MICHELLE)
August 31, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - In response to #5 Plaintiff's Letter Request, return date extensions under Rule 7.1 are automatic in nature and require no action by the Clerk unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jc, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer or Stay, Pursuant to First-Filed Rule 7.1(d)(5) by OSCAR SANCHEZ. (CASSORLA, MICHELLE)
August 27, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer or Stay, Pursuant to First-Filed Rule. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer or Stay, Pursuant to First-Filed Rule by KOHL'S CORPORATION, KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Amanda Van Hoose Garofalo, #3 Exhibit A-Collins Complaint, #4 Exhibit B-Collins Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit C-June 11, 2018 Order on Motion to Transfer, #6 Exhibit D-March 25, 2019 Transcript of Oral Decision Hearing, #7 Exhibit E-Oscar Sanchez Opt-in Consent Form, #8 Exhibit F-August 10, 2020 Order, #9 Exhibit G-August 14, 2020 Memorandum and Order, #10 Exhibit H-August 25, 2020 Order, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN HOOSE GAROFALO, AMANDA)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE CASSORLA on behalf of OSCAR SANCHEZ (CASSORLA, MICHELLE)
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KOHL'S CORPORATION, KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC.. (VAN HOOSE GAROFALO, AMANDA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KOHL'S CORPORATION, KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number MRS-L-001429-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11232120), filed by KOHL'S CORPORATION, KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VAN HOOSE GAROFALO, AMANDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANCHEZ v. KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA LEE VAN HOOSE GAROFALO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHL'S CORPORATION
Represented By: AMANDA LEE VAN HOOSE GAROFALO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSCAR SANCHEZ
Represented By: MICHELLE CASSORLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?