THERAPEUTICSMD, INC. v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: THERAPEUTICSMD, INC.
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. and TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2020cv11087
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint TherapeuticsMD, Inc.'s Answer to Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Counterclaims by THERAPEUTICSMD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BATON, WILLIAM)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The telephonic scheduling conference set for October 15, 2020 is cancelled. A telephone status conference is set for October 28, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/21/2020. (as, )
September 18, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES; that Civil Action Nos. 20-3485 and 20-11087 (the "Consolidated Actions") are consolidated for all purposes, including discovery, case management, and trial, subject to further order of the Court; that the Rule 16 conference scheduled for October 15, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. in Civil Action No. 20-11087 (D.I. No. 13 in Civil Action No. 20-11087) is hereby adjourned; that all filings going forward shall be filed in Civil Action No. 20-3485 and that Civil Action No. 20-11087 shall be administratively terminated by the Clerk's office.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/18/2020. (ld, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 Letter from TherapeuticsMD, Inc. to the Hon. Edward S. Kiel, U.S.M.J.. (BATON, WILLIAM)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (WALSH, WILLIAM)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on October 15, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in instructions. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/10/2020. (as, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. identifying Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (WALSH, LIZA)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by All Defendants.(WALSH, LIZA)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk Theresa L. Burnett on 09/02/2020. (man)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Dismissal of Complaint as to Defendant TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED and Amendment of Caption re #8 Letter with Stipulation. Defendant TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED terminated. etc. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/8/2020. (dam, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti, U.S.D.J. enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Refund of Fees from William C. Baton re #1 Complaint (finance notified).. (BATON, WILLIAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ld, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of THERAPEUTICSMD, INC. (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA on behalf of THERAPEUTICSMD, INC. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
August 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THERAPEUTICSMD, INC.. (BATON, WILLIAM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11245400), filed by THERAPEUTICSMD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BATON, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THERAPEUTICSMD, INC. v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERAPEUTICSMD, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?