BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED et al v. PERRIGO ISRAEL PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC and BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS INC.
Defendant: PERRIGO ISRAEL PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED and PERRIGO COMPANY PLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv11807
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Civil Action No.'s 20-5426 and 20-11807 are consolidated for all purposes. Civil Action No. 20-5426 shall be the Lead Case. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/3/2020. (dam, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS INC.. PERRIGO COMPANY PLC waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; PERRIGO ISRAEL PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (DENI, WILLIAM)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, PERRIGO ISRAEL PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
August 30, 2020 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ld, )
August 28, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS INC., BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC (LOWER, J.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS INC., BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC. (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, PERRIGO ISRAEL PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11277437), filed by BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 L. Civ. R. 11.2 & 40.1 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED et al v. PERRIGO ISRAEL PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS INC.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO ISRAEL PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO COMPANY PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?