DISCOVER GROWTH FUND, LLC v. LESTER et al
Appellee: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS (DISBANDED), IMMUNE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and JEFFREY A. LESTER
Appellant: DISCOVER GROWTH FUND, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv12247
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Bankruptcy Appeal set for 1/19/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The appeal will be decided on the papers. No appearance is required unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (dam)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Additional Items to be included in Record on Appeal by Appellee JEFFREY A. LESTER re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (dam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2020: #1 Transmittal, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (dam, ).
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues by Appellant DISCOVER GROWTH FUND, LLC re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court's records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable CLAIRE C. CECCHI, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as 'Courtesy Copies' and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically; the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant's brief; the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee's brief. Appellant Brief due by 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet)(dam)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-13273 (VFP), filed by DISCOVER GROWTH FUND, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISCOVER GROWTH FUND, LLC v. LESTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS (DISBANDED)
Represented By: JOHN S. MAIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: IMMUNE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MORRIS S. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JEFFREY A. LESTER
Represented By: JONATHAN I. RABINOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DISCOVER GROWTH FUND, LLC
Represented By: DALE EDWARD BARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?