PAUL v. TSOUKARIS et al
Petitioner: PAUL TEAJNAUTH and TEAJNAUTH PAUL
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS, GUY CIRILLO, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM P. BARR and CHAD F. WOLF
Case Number: 2:2020cv12369
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Admitting Benjamin F. Heidlage and Peter J. Brody Pro Hac Vice, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/14/20. (jc, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by TEAJNAUTH PAUL re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KERNER, ZACHARY)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, GUY CIRILLO re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Answer to Petition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (CDC Interim Guidance of Management of COVID-19 in detention facilities), #2 Exhibit 2(Memorandum for Wardens on COVID-19, dated March 27, 2020), #3 Exhibit 3(ICE guidance regarding COVID-19, dated April 4, 2020), #4 Exhibit 4 (COVID-19 Pandemic Response, dated September 4, 2020), #5 Exhibit 5 (Declaration of Director Ortiz, dated September 15, 2020), #6 Exhibit 6 (Declaration of Dr. Anicette), #7 Exhibit 7 (Notice to Appear), #8 Exhibit 8 (Criminal Complaint), #9 Exhibit 9 (Judgment of Conviction), #10 Exhibit 10 (Criminal Complaint), #11 Exhibit 11 (Judgment of Conviction), #12 Exhibit 12 (Queens County criminal document), #13 Exhibit 13 (immigration judge's order of removal), #14 Exhibit 14 (Petitioner's note), #15 Exhibit 15 (BIA decision, dated June 30, 2020))(DHARIA, KRUTI)
September 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Seal Medical Records. Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by KRUTI D. DHARIA on behalf of WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, GUY CIRILLO (DHARIA, KRUTI)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Seal Medical Records by TEAJNAUTH PAUL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachary Kerner, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KERNER, ZACHARY)
September 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Benjamin F. Heidlage and Peter J. Brody). Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Benjamin F. Heidlage and Peter J. Brody) by TEAJNAUTH PAUL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachary Kerner, #2 Declaration of Benjamin F. Heidlage, #3 Declaration of Peter J. Brody, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KERNER, ZACHARY)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, applicable to 2241 through Rule 1(b), this Court has examined the Petition and determined that dismissal prior to submission of an answer and the record is not warranted, ORDERED that, within 14 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall electronically file a full and complete answer to the petition and motion, which responds to the factual and legal allegations of the Petition paragraph by paragraph etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/9/2020. (bt, )
September 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
September 6, 2020 Judge Susan D. Wigenton added. (ps, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by PAUL TEAJNAUTH. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KERNER, ZACHARY)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Exhibit to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, Exhibit E to September 4, 2020 Kerner Declaration by PAUL TEAJNAUTH. (KERNER, ZACHARY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, Exhibit D to September 4, 2020 Kerner Declaration by PAUL TEAJNAUTH. (KERNER, ZACHARY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, Exhibit C to September 4, 2020 Kerner Declaration by PAUL TEAJNAUTH. (KERNER, ZACHARY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, Exhibit B to September 4, 2020 Kerner Declaration by PAUL TEAJNAUTH. (KERNER, ZACHARY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus COVID-19 ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ANJDC-11314654.), filed by PAUL TEAJNAUTH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachary Kerner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Civil Cover Sheet, #28 Certificate of Service)(KERNER, ZACHARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAUL v. TSOUKARIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAUL TEAJNAUTH
Represented By: ZACHARY KERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TEAJNAUTH PAUL
Represented By: ZACHARY KERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GUY CIRILLO
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM J. ANDERSON
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?