ROBERT FISCHER, M.D. v. BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA
Plaintiff: ROBERT FISCHER, M.D.
Defendant: FLORIDA BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD, BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA and BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv12403
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 12/22/2020. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/23/2020. (ams, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Plaintiff. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT FISCHER, M.D.. BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA, INC. served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA, INC., filed by ROBERT FISCHER, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E, #2 Summons)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
September 9, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Enter party information as it appears on Complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ams, )
September 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FLORIDA BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11322109), filed by ROBERT FISCHER, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBERT FISCHER, M.D. v. BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT FISCHER, M.D.
Represented By: MICHAEL GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?