GAAAYS IN SPAAACE v. JOHN DOES (1-10) et al
Plaintiff: GAAAYS IN SPAAACE
Defendant: JANE DOES (1-10), JOHN DOES (1-10) and DOE ENTITIES (1-10)
Case Number: 2:2020cv12412
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY that any information disclosed to Plaintiff in response to the subpoena issued under Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure may be used by Plaintiff solely for the purposes of this litigation; any subpoena issued pursuant to this Order shall be deemed an appropriate court order under 47 U.S.C. 551; good faith attempts by Comcast to notify the subscriber(s) shall constitute compliance with this Order; and Plaintiff will provide a copy of any responsive materials to any defendant who enters an appearance in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/13/2020. (sm)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/13/2020. (sm)
September 10, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave of Court to Take Expedited Discovery. Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave of Court to Take Expedited Discovery by GAAAYS IN SPAAACE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(HEIM, DAVID)
September 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (ak, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GAAAYS IN SPAAACE. (HEIM, DAVID)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11323155) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GAAAYS IN SPAAACE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HEIM, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAAAYS IN SPAAACE v. JOHN DOES (1-10) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAAAYS IN SPAAACE
Represented By: DAVID P. HEIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE ENTITIES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?