MULLIN et al v. US BANK TRUST, N.A.
Appellee: US BANK TRUST, N.A.
Appellant: MONALIE MULLIN
Trustee: STEVEN KARZMAN
Case Number: 2:2020cv12642
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER WITHDRAWING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/10/2020. (ams, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 WITHDRAWAL OF APPEAL filed by Monalie Mullin. (sm)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION OF FAILURE TO FILE DESIGNATION OF RECORD of Susan Zive on behalf of MONALIE MULLIN. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Documents)(sm)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERRI JENNIFER SMITH on behalf of US BANK TRUST, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SMITH, SHERRI)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-12065, filed by MONALIE MULLIN. (Attachments: #1 Application of Fee Waiver, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Transmittal of Documents, #4 Docket Sheet)(sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MULLIN et al v. US BANK TRUST, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US BANK TRUST, N.A.
Represented By: SHERRI JENNIFER SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MONALIE MULLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: STEVEN KARZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?