KITOV PHARMA LTD. v. LUPIN LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: KITOV PHARMA LTD.
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and LUPIN LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2020cv12849
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MICHAEL J. ABERNATHY, SANJAY K. MURTHY, MARIA E. DOUKAS and BRITTANY A. WASHINGTON, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jc, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brittany A. Washington to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11409502.) (BARTLE, HARVEY)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Maria E. Doukas to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11409478.) (BARTLE, HARVEY)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sanjay K. Murthy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11409437.) (BARTLE, HARVEY)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Abernathy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11409387.) (BARTLE, HARVEY)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Michael J. Abernathy, Sanjay K. Murthy, Maria E. Doukas, and Brittany A. Washington are permitted to appear and participate in this action as attorneys for Kitov, etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 9/25/20. (jc, )
September 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KITOV PHARMA LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Harvey Bartle, IV, #2 Certification of Michael J. Abernathy, #3 Certification of Sanjay K. Murthy, #4 Certification of Maria E. Doukas, #5 Certification of Brittany A. Washington, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(BARTLE, HARVEY)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case Number 3:20-cv-12849. Case reallocated to Newark and reassigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp, Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/24/2020. (jjc, )
September 23, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.5 Patent Pilot Project, case shall be reassigned to a designated patent judge. (gxh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KITOV PHARMA LTD.. LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (BARTLE, HARVEY)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KITOV PHARMA LTD.. LUPIN LIMITED served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (BARTLE, HARVEY)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (mg)
September 18, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by HARVEY BARTLE, IV on behalf of KITOV PHARMA LTD. (BARTLE, HARVEY)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KITOV PHARMA LTD.. (BARTLE, HARVEY)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11376316), filed by KITOV PHARMA LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form)(BARTLE, HARVEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KITOV PHARMA LTD. v. LUPIN LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KITOV PHARMA LTD.
Represented By: HARVEY BARTLE, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?