NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY v. KINDER MORGAN BULK TERMINALS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Defendant: KINDER MORGAN BULK TERMINALS, LLC and KINDER MORGAN LIQUID TERMINALS, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv12867
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion to Extend Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Plead. The deadline for Defendants to file an answer or otherwise plead is set for 12/18/2020. etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 10/13/2020. (dam)
October 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(COHEN, JEFFREY)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. KINDER MORGAN LIQUID TERMINALS, LLC. served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (PALOMBO, ERIC)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. KINDER MORGAN BULK TERMINALS, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (PALOMBO, ERIC)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW JOHN HASKINS on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (HASKINS, MATTHEW)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC C. PALOMBO on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (PALOMBO, ERIC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KINDER MORGAN BULK TERMINALS, LLC, KINDER MORGAN LIQUID TERMINALS, LLC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER RELLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case reallocated to Newark and reassigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk for all further proceedings. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/21/20. (ak, )
September 18, 2020 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (mmb, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY identifying Norfolk Southern Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (COHEN, JEFFREY)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KINDER MORGAN LIQUID TERMINALS, LLC., Kinder Morgan Bulk Terminals, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11377565), filed by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons Summons - Kinder Morgan Bulk Terminals, LLC, #3 Summons Summons - Kinder Morgan Liquid Terminals, LLC)(COHEN, JEFFREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY v. KINDER MORGAN BULK TERMINALS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINDER MORGAN BULK TERMINALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINDER MORGAN LIQUID TERMINALS, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: JEFFREY DAVID COHEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JOHN HASKINS
Represented By: ERIC C. PALOMBO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?