D'AMBLY v. EXOO et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL D'AMBLY
Defendant: CHRISTIAN EXOO, VIJAYA GADDE, ANTIFASH GORDON, TWITTER, INC., TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY, NEW YORK DAILY NEWS, COHEN, WEISS, AND SIMON, LLP and ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 2:2020cv12880
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam Mastroleo, Esq.. Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam Mastroleo, Esq. by ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Monica Barrett, #2 Declaration Adam Mastroleo, #3 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(BARRETT, MONICA)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Letter from Michael J. Canning re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Count XIII of Plaintiff's Complaint. (CANNING, MICHAEL)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Stipulation document number 30 filed by C. MARLBOROUGH on 11/12/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference please use the Stipulation event under Other documents. (bt, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by CHRISTIAN EXOO. (MARLBOROUGH, CHRISTOPHER)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond by CHRISTIAN EXOO. (MARLBOROUGH, CHRISTOPHER)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER MARLBOROUGH on behalf of CHRISTIAN EXOO (MARLBOROUGH, CHRISTOPHER)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss Count XIII of Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Count XIII of Plaintiff's Complaint by COHEN, WEISS, AND SIMON, LLP. Responses due by 11/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Michael J. Canning, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CANNING, MICHAEL)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by NEW YORK DAILY NEWS, TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY.(SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time until November 20, 2020 for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/30/2020. (bt, )
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY re #19 MOTION to Dismiss (BARRETT, MONICA)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT ORDER granting Defendants #17 Pro Hac Vice Application for admission of Ari Holtzblatt, Esq and Patrick J. Carome, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/30/2020. (bt, )
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Proposed Order by ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY re #19 MOTION to Dismiss . (BARRETT, MONICA)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of William L. Fox re #19 MOTION to Dismiss by ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY. (BARRETT, MONICA)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 BRIEF in Support filed by ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY re #19 MOTION to Dismiss (BARRETT, MONICA)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY. (BARRETT, MONICA)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY. (BARRETT, MONICA)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Proposed Order Consent Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission by VIJAYA GADDE, TWITTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren James-Weir, Esq., #2 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt, Esq., #3 Declaration of Patrick J. Carome, Esq., #4 Supplement Letter to Judge Joseph Dickson)(JAMES-WEIR, LAUREN)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by VIJAYA GADDE, TWITTER, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/26/2020. (bt, )
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Crossclaims Filed By Cohen, Weiss And Simon, LLP Pursuant To Local Civil Rule 6.1(b).. (JAMES-WEIR, LAUREN)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN JAMES-WEIR on behalf of VIJAYA GADDE, TWITTER, INC. (JAMES-WEIR, LAUREN)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER that CWP is granted leave to file their Answer or Otherwise Move within 2 days of the filing of this Consent Order, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/23/20. (jc, )
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COHEN, WEISS, AND SIMON, LLP. (CANNING, MICHAEL)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM for contribution and indemnification against CHRISTIAN EXOO, VIJAYA GADDE, NEW YORK DAILY NEWS, ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY, TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY, TWITTER, INC. by COHEN, WEISS, AND SIMON, LLP.(CANNING, MICHAEL)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Proposed Order (Consent Order) For Extension to Answer by COHEN, WEISS, AND SIMON, LLP re #1 Complaint,. (CANNING, MICHAEL)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by VIJAYA GADDE, TWITTER, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/30/2020. (bt, )
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY, NEW YORK DAILY NEWS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/2/2020. (bt, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TWITTER, INC.. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG on behalf of VIJAYA GADDE, TWITTER, INC. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD SCHARLAT on behalf of NEW YORK DAILY NEWS, TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY (SCHARLAT, RICHARD)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter document number 4 filed by M. BARRETT on 10/14/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference please use the Letter event found under Other documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (bt, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Defendant, St. Lawrence University's request is Granted. Defendant must respond to the Complaint on or before 10/30/20. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/15/20. (jbb)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY. (BARRETT, MONICA)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MONICA C. BARRETT on behalf of ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY (BARRETT, MONICA)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COHEN, WEISS, AND SIMON, LLP, CHRISTIAN EXOO, VIJAYA GADDE, NEW YORK DAILY NEWS, ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY, TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY, TWITTER, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COHEN, WEISS, AND SIMON, LLP, CHRISTIAN EXOO, VIJAYA GADDE, NEW YORK DAILY NEWS, ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY, TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY, TWITTER, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11380831) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DANIEL D'AMBLY. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT)(TRAINOR, PATRICK)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (ps, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'AMBLY v. EXOO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN EXOO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER MARLBOROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIJAYA GADDE
Represented By: LAUREN JAMES-WEIR
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTIFASH GORDON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER MARLBOROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWITTER, INC.
Represented By: LAUREN JAMES-WEIR
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD SCHARLAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK DAILY NEWS
Represented By: RICHARD SCHARLAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COHEN, WEISS, AND SIMON, LLP
Represented By: MICHAEL J. CANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: MONICA C. BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL D'AMBLY
Represented By: PATRICK TRAINOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?