VANKPANA v. BARR et al
Petitioner: MELVIN CHARLES VANKPANA
Respondent: Acting Secretary CHAD WOLF, DAVID H WETMORE, GUY CIRILLO, JAMES MCHENRY, TONY H PHAM, WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM P. BARR and JOHN TSOUKARIS
Case Number: 2:2020cv12995
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW043628 as to Lauren Major, Esq. (lag, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from AUSA Hajdarpasic Regarding Status Update. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, BIA Motion to Reopen Order)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/25/2020. (ro, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Motion Hearing held by telephone conferencing on 9/25/2020 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MELVIN CHARLES VANKPANA. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MELVIN CHARLES VANKPANA re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WEINER, JORDAN)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM P. BARR, GUY CIRILLO, JAMES MCHENRY, TONY H PHAM, JOHN TSOUKARIS, DAVID H WETMORE, CHAD WOLF re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit B, BIA Stay of Removal Order)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADMITTING LAUREN MAJOR PRO HAC VICE, etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/22/2020. (lag, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the telephone conference held today, September 22, 2020, response to the pending #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is due by 9/24/2020. Oral argument is scheduled for 9/25/2020 at 10:30 AM by telephone conferencing. Counsel are to utilize the dial-in information previously provided by the court for this call. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/22/2020. (ro, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Hearing held by telephone conference on 9/22/2020 as to the pending emergent application. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MELVIN CHARLES VANKPANA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Major, #2 Declaration of Jordan Weiner, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(WEINER, JORDAN)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled for today, September 22, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. regarding the pending application for TRO. The court will provide counsel with dial-in information. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/22/2020. (ro, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MELVIN CHARLES VANKPANA. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Jordan Weiner, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Certificate of Service)(WEINER, JORDAN)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number BNJDC-11385944.), COMPLAINT against JOHN TSOUKARIS, DAVID H WETMORE, TONY H PHAM, JAMES MCHENRY, CHAD WOLF, WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM P. BARR, GUY CIRILLO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number BNJDC-11385944), filed by MELVIN CHARLES VANKPANA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Jordan Weiner, #3 Exhibit A Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit B Immigration Judge Decision, #5 Exhibit C Filing Receipt for Motion to Reopen, #6 Exhibit D Declaration of Lauren Major, #7 Exhibit E BIA Denial of Emergency Stay Motion, #8 Exhibit Application for Asylum and Withholding of Removal, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Melvin Vankpana, #10 Certificate of Service)(WEINER, JORDAN)
September 22, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
September 22, 2020 Judge John Michael Vazquez added. (ps, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VANKPANA v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary CHAD WOLF
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID H WETMORE
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GUY CIRILLO
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JAMES MCHENRY
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TONY H PHAM
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM J. ANDERSON
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MELVIN CHARLES VANKPANA
Represented By: JORDAN WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?