EHEALTHINSURANCE SERVICES, INC. v. SMITH, JR. et al
Defendant: MICHAEL T. SMITH, JR., DUFF INSURANCE BROKERAGE, INC., HEALTH ADVISORS OF AMERICA, INC. and CAMPBELL INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Petitioner: EHEALTHINSURANCE SERVICES, INC.
Interested Party: iThreat Cyber Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv13342
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by EHEALTHINSURANCE SERVICES, INC. PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION (Attachments: #1 Agreed Order entered by the Court in the underlying action on November 16, 2020)(KLAUSNER, TONIA)
November 9, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF (Memorandum of Law in Reply to Petitioner's Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum, and Reply in Support of Respondents' Cross-Motion to Compel) (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Respondents' request that the combined reply is due three days from the date that the request is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/4/2020. (sm)
November 4, 2020 Filing 20 Letter from Christine I. Gannon to the Hon. John M. Vazquez, U.S.D.J. and Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. requesting extension of time to file a Combined Reply Brief. (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
October 28, 2020 Filing 19 Letter from Christine I. Gannon to the Hon. John M. Vazquez, U.S.D.J. and Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. requesting leave to file a Combined Reply Brief re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, #18 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,. (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by EHEALTHINSURANCE SERVICES, INC. re #9 Cross MOTION to Compel and in Opposition to Motion to Quash [D.E. 1] AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PETITION TO QUASH OR MODIFY THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tonia Ouellette Klausner, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(KLAUSNER, TONIA)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by iThreat Cyber Group, Inc. re #9 Cross MOTION to Compel and in Opposition to Motion to Quash [D.E. 1] (YU, JAMES)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: Petitioner's application for an extension to file, (ECF No. 13), is granted. Petitioner must file on or before 10/26/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/16/2020. (tjd)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Tonia Ouellette Klausner to The Honorable Joseph A. Dickson regarding extension of time to file response re #9 Cross MOTION to Compel and in Opposition to Motion to Quash [D.E. 1]. (KLAUSNER, TONIA)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting iThreat an extension of time to file their Opposition/Reply papers until 10/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/14/2020. (sm)
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Cross MOTION to Compel and in Opposition to Motion to Quash [D.E. 1] by EHEALTHINSURANCE SERVICES, INC.. (KLAUSNER, TONIA)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Woodard to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11482534.) (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Oliver Alan Ruiz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11482502.) (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Oliver Alan Ruiz and Jonathan Woodard, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/9/2020. (ams, )
October 8, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 Cross MOTION to Compel and in Opposition to Motion to Quash [D.E. 1]. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 Cross MOTION to Compel and in Opposition to Motion to Quash [D.E. 1] by CAMPBELL INSURANCE GROUP, INC., DUFF INSURANCE BROKERAGE, INC., HEALTH ADVISORS OF AMERICA, INC., MICHAEL T. SMITH, JR.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Jonathan Woodard, #3 Exhibits A and B, #4 Exhibits C through I, #5 Exhibits J through M, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(GANNON, CHRISTINE)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Christine I. Gannon to the Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. regarding pro hac vice admission. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Oliver Alan Ruiz, #2 Certification of Jonathan Woodard, #3 Certification of Christine I. Gannon, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GANNON, CHRISTINE)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: In connection with Respondents' request to extend the deadline to oppose Petitioner's motion (ECF No. 6): the request is GRANTED, and Respondents will file their papers on or before 10/08/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/2/2020. (tjd)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Christine I. Gannon to the Hon. John M. Vazquez, U.S.D.J. and Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. regarding modified schedule. (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ZAHIRE DESIREE ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS on behalf of CAMPBELL INSURANCE GROUP, INC., DUFF INSURANCE BROKERAGE, INC., HEALTH ADVISORS OF AMERICA, INC., MICHAEL T. SMITH, JR. (ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS, ZAHIRE)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON on behalf of CAMPBELL INSURANCE GROUP, INC., DUFF INSURANCE BROKERAGE, INC., HEALTH ADVISORS OF AMERICA, INC., MICHAEL T. SMITH, JR. (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. YU on behalf of iThreat Cyber Group, Inc. (YU, JAMES)
September 29, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas PETITION TO QUASH OR MODIFY THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number ANJDC-11411792.). Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from James S. Yu on behalf of Non-Party joining in Plaintiff's Petition to Quash or Modify Third Party Subpoena re #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas PETITION TO QUASH OR MODIFY THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number ANJDC-11411792.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - 09-21-20 Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Responses and Objections to Subpoena)(YU, JAMES)
September 28, 2020 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (ps, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas PETITION TO QUASH OR MODIFY THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number ANJDC-11411792.), filed by EHEALTHINSURANCE SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Tonia Ouellette Klausner, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(KLAUSNER, TONIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EHEALTHINSURANCE SERVICES, INC. v. SMITH, JR. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL T. SMITH, JR.
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: ZAHIRE DESIREE ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUFF INSURANCE BROKERAGE, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: ZAHIRE DESIREE ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTH ADVISORS OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: ZAHIRE DESIREE ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPBELL INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: ZAHIRE DESIREE ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EHEALTHINSURANCE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: TONIA O. KLAUSNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: iThreat Cyber Group, Inc.
Represented By: JAMES S. YU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?