ESTATE OF CHARLOTTE M. TRAUTMANN v. WG CRANFORD SH, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF CHARLOTTE M. TRAUTMANN, THROUGH JENNIFER CIUBA A.K.A JENNIFER K. TRAUTMANN EXECUTOR and ESTATE OF CHARLOTTE M. TRAUTMANN
Defendant: JANE DOE PHYSICIANS (1-10), CERTIFIED NURSING AIDES, PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-10), JANE DOE THERAPISTS (1-10), JANE DOE NURSES (110), JKL PARTNERSHIPS (1-10), JANE DOE TECHNICIANS (1-10), GHI COMPANIES (1-10), WG CRANFORD SH, LLC doing business as ATRIA CRANFORD, VENTAS AOC OPERATING HOLDINGS, INC. and ATRIA MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv13476
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Defendants' Letter. The Initial Conference is adjourned pending the disposition of the Motion to Remand. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/16/2020. (dam)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Andre J. Major re #7 Order. (MAJOR, ANDRE) Modified on 11/12/2020 (dam).
November 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION to Remand To State Court. Motion set for 1/25/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nic, )
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Letter. ORDER resetting hearing on #9 Plaintiff's Motion to remand. Motion reset for 1/24/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/9/2020. (dam)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Andre J. Major re #9 First MOTION to Remand To State Court. (MAJOR, ANDRE)
October 29, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 Plaintiff's First MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand To State Court by ESTATE OF CHARLOTTE M. TRAUTMANN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Brief, #11 Certificate of Service)(LAURI, JONATHAN)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN LAURI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LAURI, JONATHAN)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/7/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/6/2020. (seb)
September 29, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
September 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDRE J. MAJOR on behalf of ATRIA MANAGEMENT COMPANY, VENTAS AOC OPERATING HOLDINGS, INC., WG CRANFORD SH, LLC D/B/A ATRIA CRANFORD (MAJOR, ANDRE)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATRIA MANAGEMENT COMPANY, VENTAS AOC OPERATING HOLDINGS, INC., WG CRANFORD SH, LLC D/B/A ATRIA CRANFORD identifying Ventas Inc. is a publicly held corporation which indirectly owns more than 10% of Defendants stock as Corporate Parent.. (HOWELL, KELLY)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VENTAS AOC OPERATING HOLDINGS, INC.. (HOWELL, KELLY)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATRIA MANAGEMENT COMPANY, WG CRANFORD SH, LLC D/B/A ATRIA CRANFORD identifying Ventas AOC Operating Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HOWELL, KELLY)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ATRIA MANAGEMENT COMPANY, VENTAS AOC OPERATING HOLDINGS, INC., WG CRANFORD SH, LLC D/B/A ATRIA CRANFORD. (HOWELL, KELLY)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ATRIA MANAGEMENT COMPANY, WG CRANFORD SH, LLC, VENTAS AOC OPERATING HOLDINGS, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF UNION COUNTY, case number UNN-L-2372-20. (Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11422775), filed by ATRIA MANAGEMENT COMPANY, WG CRANFORD SH, LLC D/B/A ATRIA CRANFORD, VENTAS AOC OPERATING HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Jones Howell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service)(HOWELL, KELLY) Modified on 10/1/2020 (dam, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF CHARLOTTE M. TRAUTMANN v. WG CRANFORD SH, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE PHYSICIANS (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTIFIED NURSING AIDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE THERAPISTS (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE NURSES (110)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKL PARTNERSHIPS (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE TECHNICIANS (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI COMPANIES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WG CRANFORD SH, LLC doing business as ATRIA CRANFORD
Represented By: ANDRE J. MAJOR
Represented By: KELLY JONES HOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VENTAS AOC OPERATING HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: ANDRE J. MAJOR
Represented By: KELLY JONES HOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATRIA MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Represented By: ANDRE J. MAJOR
Represented By: KELLY JONES HOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF CHARLOTTE M. TRAUTMANN, THROUGH JENNIFER CIUBA A.K.A JENNIFER K. TRAUTMANN EXECUTOR
Represented By: JONATHAN FRANCIS LAURI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF CHARLOTTE M. TRAUTMANN
Represented By: JONATHAN LAURI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?