LI et al v. GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD D/B/A BITMART, A GRAND CAYMAN ISLANDS CORPORATION
Plaintiff: JIA LI and DAVID HSIAO
Defendant: GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD D/B/A BITMART, A GRAND CAYMAN ISLANDS CORPORATION and GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD A GRAND CAYMAN ISLANDS CORPORATION doing business as BITMART
Case Number: 2:2020cv14377
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 12/9/20. (LM, )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/4/2020. (sm)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/4/2020. (sm)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD.(dam)
November 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION temporary restraints re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting briefing schedule as to the pending #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #9 MOTION temporary restraints. Responses due by 11/25/2020 and Replies due by 12/1/2020. Oral argument by telephone conferencing is scheduled for 12/2/2020 at 2:00 PM. Counsel are to utilize the dial-in information previously provided by the court for this hearing. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 11/16/2020. (ro, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Status telephone conference held on 11/16/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: As to Plaintiffs pending motion for a temporary restraining order, the Court will hold a telephone conference with the parties on November 16, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. to discuss a briefing schedule. Plaintiffs counsel shall inform defense counsel or, if no counsel has entered an appearance, Defendant of the date and time of the telephone conference. The court will provide counsel with dial in information for the call. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 11/13/2020. (ro, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION temporary restraints re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplement proof of service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCORDO, ANTHONY)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Miscellaneous Hearing by telephone conference held on 11/5/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling a telephone conference for today, November 5, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. regarding the pending motion for emergent releif. The court will provide counsel with dial-in information for the call. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 11/5/2020. (ro, )
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(SCORDO, ANTHONY)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by JIA LI, DAVID HSIAO as to GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCORDO, ANTHONY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by JIA LI, DAVID HSIAO as to GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCORDO, ANTHONY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by JIA LI, DAVID HSIAO as to GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD D/B/A BITMART, A GRAND CAYMAN ISLANDS CORPORATION. (SCORDO, ANTHONY)
October 20, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Parties are to be entered separately; d/b/a parties are added under alias. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ld, )
October 14, 2020 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (ps, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD D/B/A BITMART, A GRAND CAYMAN ISLANDS CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11495608), filed by JIA LI, DAVID HSIAO.(SCORDO, ANTHONY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LI et al v. GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD D/B/A BITMART, A GRAND CAYMAN ISLANDS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD D/B/A BITMART, A GRAND CAYMAN ISLANDS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GBM FOUNDATION COMPANY LTD A GRAND CAYMAN ISLANDS CORPORATION doing business as BITMART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIA LI
Represented By: ANTHONY SCORDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HSIAO
Represented By: ANTHONY SCORDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?