HOLLOWAY v. NASSAU PROVISIONS et al
Plaintiff: MEGHAN M HOLLOWAY and MEGHAN M. HOLLOWAY
Defendant: NASSAU PROVISIONS, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., NASSAU PROVISIONS KOSHER FOODS, INC., ABC COMPANY, INC. 11-20, JOHN DOE 11-10, JANE ROE 1-10, JOHN DOE 1-10, NASSAU PROVISIONS KOSHER FOODS INC., ABC COMPANY, INC. 1-10, JANE ROE 11-10, JANE ROE 21-30, JOHN DOE 21-30, RICHARD ROE 1-10 and GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv15506
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (gh, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Essex County Veterans Courthouse50 West Market StreetNewark, NJ 07102 State No: L-006444-20. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (gh, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Remand to the Superior Court - Essex County. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 12/23/20. (gh, )
November 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 Defendant's First MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION to Remand To State Court by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certification, #3 Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(PASQUALE, JOSEPH)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH STEPHEN PASQUALE on behalf of GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (PASQUALE, JOSEPH)
November 3, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps, )
November 3, 2020 Judge William J. Martini and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (ps, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NASSAU PROVISIONS, NASSAU PROVISIONS KOSHER FOODS, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF ESSEX COUNTY, L-006444-20. (Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11602541), filed by NASSAU PROVISIONS, NASSAU PROVISIONS KOSHER FOODS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(HOLLAND, WARREN) Modified on 11/4/2020 (dam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLOWAY v. NASSAU PROVISIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGHAN M HOLLOWAY
Represented By: DAVID T. ERCOLANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGHAN M. HOLLOWAY
Represented By: DAVID T. ERCOLANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASSAU PROVISIONS
Represented By: WARREN HOLLAND
Represented By: MATTHEW MORONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASSAU PROVISIONS KOSHER FOODS, INC.
Represented By: WARREN HOLLAND
Represented By: MATTHEW MORONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANY, INC. 11-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 11-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASSAU PROVISIONS KOSHER FOODS INC.
Represented By: WARREN HOLLAND
Represented By: MATTHEW MORONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANY, INC. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE 11-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE 21-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 21-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH STEPHEN PASQUALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?