GRIFFIN v. THE CITY OF NEWARK et al
Plaintiff: Ahmaad Griffin
Defendant: CITY OF NEWARK, Jovanny Crespo, HECTOR ORTIZ, NEWARK POLICE DEPARTMENT and P.O JOVANNY CRESPO
Case Number: 2:2020cv17290
Filed: November 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Essex County (RABASCA, MICHAEL)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Letter request for a one cycle adjournment of the #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Essex County so that it may be heard on 1/19/2021 etc. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 1/4/2021. (bt, )
December 24, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Michael A. Rabasca requesting an adjournment and extension of time to file reply brief re #5 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Essex County, #6 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (RABASCA, MICHAEL)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CITY OF NEWARK, NEWARK POLICE DEPARTMENT re #5 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Essex County (ANTOINE, WILSON)
December 7, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Essex County. Motion set for 1/4/2021 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Essex County by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Declaration of Counsel in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Rabasca Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Rabasca Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Rabasca Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Rabasca Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form of Order)(RABASCA, MICHAEL)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs intention to move for remand, the Court grants Defendant City of Newarks request to extend its time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint until twenty (20) days after resolution of Plaintiffs remand motion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/4/20. (tjg, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from City of Newark requesting further extension of time to respond to Complaint. (ANTOINE, WILSON)
December 3, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NEWARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, CITY OF NEWARK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/18/2020. (qa, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to City of Newark. Attorney WILSON DAVID ANTOINE for CITY OF NEWARK added. (ANTOINE, WILSON)
November 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NEWARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, CITY OF NEWARK from Essex County Superior Court, case number ESX-L-7226-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11726532), filed by NEWARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, CITY OF NEWARK. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint)(LIPSHUTZ, GARY)
November 27, 2020 Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIFFIN v. THE CITY OF NEWARK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEWARK
Represented By: GARY S. LIPSHUTZ
Represented By: WILSON DAVID ANTOINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jovanny Crespo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HECTOR ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWARK POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: GARY S. LIPSHUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O JOVANNY CRESPO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmaad Griffin
Represented By: MICHAEL J. EPSTEIN
Represented By: MICHAEL A. RABASCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?