Coleman v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: DAWN COLEMAN
Defendant: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE DISTRIBUTING LLC, ABBOTT LABORATORIES, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC. doing business as Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, ASTRAZENECA LP, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Distributing Co., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A, INC. and MERCK & CO INC doing business as Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation
In Re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Case Number: 2:2020cv17910
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Member Case Transferred in on 12/3/20 from the Southern District of Ohio 1:20-00855 for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II) (gh, )
December 3, 2020 For all Case Management Orders #click here (gh, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 17 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
December 3, 2020 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (gh, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00855. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 3, 2020 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er)
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL this action is transferred to the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/1/2020; certified by the Clerk's Office District of New Jersey on 12/1/2020. (er)
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the USDC for the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/1/2020. (er)
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Steinmetz for Defendant Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals International AG identifying Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceuticals International AG for Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc... (Naeem, Tariq)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tariq M Naeem for Defendant Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Naeem, Tariq)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 8/02/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902716) by Merck & Co., Inc. d/b/a Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation. (eh) Corrected date originally filed on 11/4/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 8/2/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902716) by AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (eh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed originally filed 7/24/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902716) by The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC. (eh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/24/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902716) by The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company. (eh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/24/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902716) by The Procter & Gamble Company. (eh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/10/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902716) by Abbott Laboratories. (eh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/10/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902716) by Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. formerly known as Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc. (eh) Modified on 11/4/2020 (eh). Modified to include last defendant on 11/4/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 5/31/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902716) by Dawn Coleman against All Defendants. (eh)
November 2, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Amended Civil Coversheet (Naeem, Tariq)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 1902716 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7732059), filed by Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Combined State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit B - Transfer Order) (Naeem, Tariq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE DISTRIBUTING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC. doing business as Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: JENNIFER L. STEINMETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA LP
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Distributing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A, INC.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: JENNIFER L. STEINMETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO INC doing business as Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN COLEMAN
Represented By: John David Holschuh, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?