EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv18479
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Answer Due Deadline Update - The #5 Letter Request submitted by EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ has been GRANTED. The answer due date for UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY has been reset for 3/4/2021. (jc, )
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Letter Request for an extension for Defendant to answer out of time, up to and including March 4, 2021. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 2/3/21. (jc, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Plaintiff. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER directing counsel to move this civil action by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to answer out of time, etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 1/26/21. (jc, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
December 8, 2020 Case to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11783020), filed by EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - L, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ
Represented By: MICHAEL GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?