SANTIAGO v. TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC et al
Plaintiff: RICARDO SANTIAGO
Defendant: TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC and JOHN DOES #1-5
Case Number: 2:2020cv18581
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC. (MAZZUCHETTI, LAURI)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC re #15 MOTION to Dismiss (MAZZUCHETTI, LAURI)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 10.1 (a))(MAZZUCHETTI, LAURI)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADMITTING JONATHAN GREENBAUM, PANIDA A. POLLAWIT AND SCOTT B. RICHMAN PRO HAC VICE; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/7/2021. (sm)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER Extending Time to February 4, 2021 for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/30/20. (jc, )
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Update - The #10 Stipulation submitted by the parties have been has been GRANTED. The answer due date for TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC has been set for 2/4/2021. (jc, )
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN T. GRAHAM on behalf of TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC (GRAHAM, GLENN)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. MAZZUCHETTI on behalf of TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC (MAZZUCHETTI, LAURI)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint . STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC. (MAZZUCHETTI, LAURI)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RICARDO SANTIAGO. TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (FREEMAN, JARRED)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Exhibit to #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RICARDO SANTIAGO. (FREEMAN, JARRED)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Exhibit to #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Panida A. Pollawit by RICARDO SANTIAGO. (FREEMAN, JARRED)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Exhibit to #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott B. Richman by RICARDO SANTIAGO. (FREEMAN, JARRED)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott B. Richman by RICARDO SANTIAGO. (FREEMAN, JARRED)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Panida A. Pollawit by RICARDO SANTIAGO. (FREEMAN, JARRED)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Greenbaum by All Plaintiffs. (FREEMAN, JARRED)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Applications to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF #4 and #5 , submitted by Jarred Freeman on 12/18/2020 contain improper signatures. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE USING THE EVENT 'EXHIBIT (TO DOCUMENT)'. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, )
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11790806) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RICARDO SANTIAGO.(FREEMAN, JARRED)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANTIAGO v. TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICARDO SANTIAGO
Represented By: JARRED S. FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTAL LIFE CHANGES LLC
Represented By: LAURI A. MAZZUCHETTI
Represented By: GLENN T. GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?