STEVENSON v. CITY OF NEWARK et al
Plaintiff: WANDA STEVENSON
Defendant: CITY OF NEWARK, RAS BARAKA, JOHN DOE, PHILLIP SCOTT, KHALIF THOMAS, THOMAS MCDONALD and JOHN DOES 1-100
Case Number: 2:2020cv18722
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WANDA STEVENSON. RAS BARAKA served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021; CITY OF NEWARK served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021; THOMAS MCDONALD served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021; PHILLIP SCOTT served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021; KHALIF THOMAS served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (ROBERTS, JOHN)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RAS BARAKA, CITY OF NEWARK, THOMAS MCDONALD, PHILLIP SCOTT, KHALIF THOMAS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN DANIEL ARSENEAULT on behalf of WANDA STEVENSON (ARSENEAULT, JOHN)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by WANDA STEVENSON as to All Defendants. (ROBERTS, JOHN)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11797510) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WANDA STEVENSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROBERTS, JOHN)
December 10, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEVENSON v. CITY OF NEWARK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEWARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAS BARAKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHALIF THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA STEVENSON
Represented By: JOHN J. ROBERTS
Represented By: JOHN DANIEL ARSENEAULT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?