VASWANI, INC. v. MANJUNATHAMURTHY et al
Plaintiff: Vaswani, Inc and VASWANI, INC.
Defendant: NANJUNDAPPA MADHUSUDHAN, POWERFIRM VENTURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., RADHIKA RAO, SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, FAIRMACS GROUP, DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, LUCIDIENT LIMITED, VISIO INGENII, LTD, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, JOANN CASTILLO, VISIOLUCID TECHNOSOFT, PVT, LTD, NAGACHETAN BANGALORE MANJUNATHAMURTHY, UDAY SHAKAR, SUNIL BUVA and UDAY SHANKAR
Case Number: 2:2020cv20288
Filed: December 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. YOST, III on behalf of DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, UDAY SHANKAR (YOST, WILLIAM)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, UDAY SHANKAR. (PALLAS, WILLIAM)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, UDAY SHANKAR.(PALLAS, WILLIAM)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VASWANI, INC.. FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. (BALDINGER, BRUCE)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUNIL BUVA, JOANN CASTILLO, DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, LUCIDIENT LIMITED, NANJUNDAPPA MADHUSUDHAN, NAGACHETAN BANGALORE MANJUNATHAMURTHY, POWERFIRM VENTURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, RADHIKA RAO, UDAY SHANKAR, VISIO INGENII, LTD, VISIOLUCID TECHNOSOFT, PVT, LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civi Cover Sheet by Vaswani, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bangalore Manjunathamurthy, #2 Summons Draft Cargoway India, #3 Summons Fairmacs Group, #4 Summons Fairmacs Shipping & Transport, #5 Summons Joann Costillo, #6 Summons Lucidient Ltd, #7 Summons Nanjundappa Madhusudhan, #8 Summons Powerfirm Ventures, #9 Summons Sreenath Rajendhranath, #10 Summons Radhika Rao, #11 Summons Uday Shankar, #12 Summons Sunil Buva, #13 Summons Visio Ingenii Ltd, #14 Summons Visiolucid Technosoft)(BALDINGER, BRUCE)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOANN CASTILLO, DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, LUCIDIENT LIMITED, NANJUNDAPPA MADHUSUDHAN, NAGACHETAN BANGALORE MANJUNATHAMURTHY, POWERFIRM VENTURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, RADHIKA RAO, UDAY SHAKAR, VISIO INGENII, LTD, VISIOLUCID TECHNOSOFT, PVT, LTD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11875226), filed by Vaswani, Inc.(BALDINGER, BRUCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VASWANI, INC. v. MANJUNATHAMURTHY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANJUNDAPPA MADHUSUDHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWERFIRM VENTURES INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADHIKA RAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH
Represented By: WILLIAM H. YOST, III
Represented By: WILLIAM JOSEPH PALLAS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIRMACS GROUP
Represented By: WILLIAM H. YOST, III
Represented By: WILLIAM JOSEPH PALLAS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD
Represented By: WILLIAM H. YOST, III
Represented By: WILLIAM JOSEPH PALLAS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCIDIENT LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISIO INGENII, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD
Represented By: WILLIAM H. YOST, III
Represented By: WILLIAM JOSEPH PALLAS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANN CASTILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISIOLUCID TECHNOSOFT, PVT, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAGACHETAN BANGALORE MANJUNATHAMURTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDAY SHAKAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNIL BUVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDAY SHANKAR
Represented By: WILLIAM H. YOST, III
Represented By: WILLIAM JOSEPH PALLAS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaswani, Inc
Represented By: BRUCE ERIC BALDINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VASWANI, INC.
Represented By: BRUCE ERIC BALDINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?