AMEREAM MANAGEMENT, LLC v. INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 825 et al
Plaintiff: AMEREAM MANAGEMENT, LLC
Defendant: BERGEN COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, AFL-CIO, CONSTRUCTION RESOURCES CORP. OF NEW JERSEY and INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 825
Case Number: 2:2020cv20345
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT ORDER adjourning motion return date for #10 MOTION to Dismiss to 4/5/2021, etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 2/16/2021. (lag, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Lawrence Bluestone, Esq. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Part of the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE)
January 26, 2021 Filing 13 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Part of the Complaint . (BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE)
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT M. GIBLIN on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 825 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GIBLIN, VINCENT)
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER HEMSLEY, III on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 825 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HEMSLEY, ALEXANDER)
January 21, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Part of the Complaint. Motion set for 2/16/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Part of the Complaint by BERGEN COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Raymond G. Heineman, #3 Memorandum of Law, #4 Certification of Service)(HEINEMAN, RAYMOND)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BERGEN COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, AFL-CIO, CONSTRUCTION RESOURCES CORP. OF NEW JERSEY, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 825, filed by AMEREAM MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Certification Certification of Service)(BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE)
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMEREAM MANAGEMENT, LLC. CONSTRUCTION RESOURCES CORP. OF NEW JERSEY waiver sent on 1/8/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMEREAM MANAGEMENT, LLC. INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 825 waiver sent on 1/8/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMEREAM MANAGEMENT, LLC. BERGEN COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, AFL-CIO waiver sent on 1/8/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND G. HEINEMAN, JR on behalf of BERGEN COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, AFL-CIO (HEINEMAN, RAYMOND)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BERGEN COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, AFL-CIO, CONSTRUCTION RESOURCES CORP. OF NEW JERSEY, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 825. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER ORDER denying Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order, etc., re D.E. #1 . Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 12/28/2020. (lag, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE BLUESTONE on behalf of AMEREAM MANAGEMENT, LLC (BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BERGEN COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, AFL-CIO, CONSTRUCTION RESOURCES CORP. OF NEW JERSEY, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 825 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11884847), filed by AMEREAM MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Verified Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Verified Complaint, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause with TRO, #7 Brief in Support of Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #8 Certification of Lawrence Bluestone, Esq., #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(GENOVA, ANGELO) Modified on 12/28/2020 (jr).
December 28, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMEREAM MANAGEMENT, LLC v. INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 825 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERGEN COUNTY BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, AFL-CIO
Represented By: RAYMOND G. HEINEMAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSTRUCTION RESOURCES CORP. OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 825
Represented By: VINCENT M. GIBLIN
Represented By: ALEXANDER HEMSLEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMEREAM MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: ANGELO JOSEPH GENOVA
Represented By: LAWRENCE BLUESTONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?