Davis v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marla Davis
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC and TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. F/K/A TAP HOLDINGS INC.
In Re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00254
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Member Case Transferred in on 1/6/21 from the Northern District of Illinois 1:20-cv-07557 for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II) (gh, )
January 6, 2021 For all Case Management Orders #click here (gh, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
January 6, 2021 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (gh, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-07557. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED to the USDC New Jersey, Newark Division the Electronic Record. (rc, )
January 4, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rc, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Mailed notice (rc, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 2/15/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to Peter J. Flowers (daj, )
December 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. F/K/A Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by Sherry Ann Knutson (Knutson, Sherry)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. F/K/A Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Hemmings, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. F/K/A Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by James R M Hemmings (Hemmings, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hemmings, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019-L-005953) filed by Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. F/K/A Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17760670. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hemmings, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A, INC.
Represented By: SHERRY A. KNUTSON
Represented By: JAMES R. M. HEMMINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
Represented By: SHERRY A. KNUTSON
Represented By: JAMES R. M. HEMMINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC
Represented By: SHERRY A. KNUTSON
Represented By: JAMES R. M. HEMMINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC
Represented By: SHERRY A. KNUTSON
Represented By: JAMES R. M. HEMMINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. F/K/A TAP HOLDINGS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Davis
Represented By: PETER J. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?