VERRELLI et al v. UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY VERRELLI, JUSTIN BALLANTYNE, SUSAN SCHULTZ, ALEX LOPEZ and VANESSA SALAZAR
Defendant: EASTERN ATLANTIC STATES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA, WILLIAM C. SPROULE, KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS and UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS
Case Number: 2:2021cv00398
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Letter from Neil Mullin, Esq.. (MULLIN, NEIL)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #32 Letter submitted by Nancy Erika Smith on 3/4/21 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user (Neil Mullin) is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jc, )
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting plaintiffs a one week extension for the filing of their reply brief until March 15, 2021. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 3/4/2021. (ld, )
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Letter from Nancy Erika Smith, Esq.. (MULLIN, NEIL)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Declaration of William C. Sproule, #3 Certification of Counsel, #4 Certificate of Service)(PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that the Motion return date be adjourned to March 15, 2021. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 2/10/2021. (ld, )
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion reset for 3/15/2021 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by EASTERN ATLANTIC STATES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, WILLIAM C. SPROULE, UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS re #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court (PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 3/1/2021 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Anthony Verrelli in support of motion to remand, #3 Declaration of A. Lopez in support of Motion to Remand, #4 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #5 Certification of Service)(PALLOTTO, VIRGINIA)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHARLES DAVANT, IV, JYOTI JINDAL and VIDYA ATRE MIRMIRA, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jc, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Vidya Mirmira to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12042949.) (PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jyoti Jindal to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12042940.) (PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Charles Davant IV to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12042916.) (PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that Plaintiff's request is denied without prejudice. If a motion for remand is filed before February 2, 2021, the Court will administratively terminate the pending motion to dismiss pending the outcome of the motion to remand. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 1/22/2021. (ld, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Letter from Seth Ptasiewicz, Esq. re #22 Letter. (PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, BRIAN F. QUINN and DANIEL M. SHANLEY, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jc, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Letter from Nancy Erika Smith, Esq. to Court re Adjournment request for motions re #10 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #11 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). (PALLOTTO, VIRGINIA)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF VIDYA ATRE MIRMIRA, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/21/2021. (ld, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JYOTI JINDAL, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/21/2021. (ld, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CHARLES DAVANT IV, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/21/2021. (ld, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel M. Shanley to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12011927.) (PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brian F. Quinn to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12011898.) (PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Exhibit to #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Certification of Vidya A. Mirmira, Esq. by EASTERN ATLANTIC STATES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, WILLIAM C. SPROULE. (PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Exhibit to #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Certification of Jyoti Jindal, Esq. by EASTERN ATLANTIC STATES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, WILLIAM C. SPROULE. (PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by VIRGINIA A. PALLOTTO on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PALLOTTO, VIRGINIA)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY ERIKA SMITH on behalf of JUSTIN BALLANTYNE, ALEX LOPEZ, VANESSA SALAZAR, SUSAN SCHULTZ, ANTHONY VERRELLI (SMITH, NANCY)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice JYOTI JINDAL, ESQ., #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice VIDYA A. MIRMIRA, ESQ., #11 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice CHARLES DAVANT IV, ESQ., #10 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Motions set for 2/16/2021 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of Vidya Atre Mirmira (ECF No. 8-3) and Certification of Jyoti Jindal (ECF No. 9-3) submitted by Seth Ptasiewicz on 1/15/21 contain improper signatures. Only the filing user (Seth Ptasiewicz) is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT EACH DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SIGNATURE using the event Exhibit (to Document) and link to the appropriate motion. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jc, )
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EASTERN ATLANTIC STATES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Brief, #3 Certification of Counsel, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by EASTERN ATLANTIC STATES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, WILLIAM C. SPROULE. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Brief, #3 Certification of Counsel, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice JYOTI JINDAL, ESQ. by EASTERN ATLANTIC STATES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, WILLIAM C. SPROULE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certification of Seth Ptasiewicz, Esq., #3 Certification of Jyoti Jindal, Esq., #4 Statement that No Brief is Necessary, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice VIDYA A. MIRMIRA, ESQ. by EASTERN ATLANTIC STATES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, WILLIAM C. SPROULE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certification of Seth Ptasiewicz, Esq., #3 Certification of Vidya A. Mirmira, Esq., #4 Statement that No Brief is Necessary, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice CHARLES DAVANT IV, ESQ. by EASTERN ATLANTIC STATES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, WILLIAM C. SPROULE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certification of Seth Ptasiewicz, Esq., #3 Certification of Charles Davant IV, Esq., #4 Statement that No Brief is Necessary, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to DANIEL M. SHANLEY, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/14/2021. (ld, )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to BRIAN F. QUINN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/14/2021. (ld, )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motions set for 2/16/2021 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certification of Seth Ptasiewicz, Esq., #3 Certification of Daniel M. Shanley, Esq., #4 Statement that No Brief is Necessary, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certification of Seth Ptasiewicz, Esq., #3 Certification of Brian F. Quinn, Esq., #4 Statement that No Brief is Necessary, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption (must match state court case), Cause of Action, Jury Demand, Party Information, Removal-Other Court Information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jc, )
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA from LAW DIVISION: ESSEX COUNTY, case number ESX-L-8177-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11946752), filed by UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Index of Exhibits to Removal, #4 Exhibits 1 to 5 to Removal, #5 Exhibit 6 to Removal. Part 1, #6 Exhibit 6 to Removal. Part 2, #7 Exhibit 6 to Removal. Part 3, #8 Exhibits 7 to 12 to Removal, #9 Exhibits 13 to 17 to Removal)(PTASIEWICZ, SETH)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VERRELLI et al v. UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY VERRELLI
Represented By: NANCY ERIKA SMITH
Represented By: VIRGINIA A. PALLOTTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN BALLANTYNE
Represented By: NANCY ERIKA SMITH
Represented By: VIRGINIA A. PALLOTTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN SCHULTZ
Represented By: NANCY ERIKA SMITH
Represented By: VIRGINIA A. PALLOTTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX LOPEZ
Represented By: NANCY ERIKA SMITH
Represented By: VIRGINIA A. PALLOTTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA SALAZAR
Represented By: NANCY ERIKA SMITH
Represented By: VIRGINIA A. PALLOTTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERN ATLANTIC STATES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS
Represented By: SETH PTASIEWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA
Represented By: SETH PTASIEWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM C. SPROULE
Represented By: SETH PTASIEWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS
Represented By: SETH PTASIEWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS
Represented By: SETH PTASIEWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?