MRS. WORLD LLC v. JOHNSON
Plaintiff: MRS WORLD, LLC and MRS. WORLD LLC
Defendant: TANA JOHNSON
Case Number: 2:2021cv00928
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter to Judge Vazquez from PASQUALE F. GIANNETTA, ESQ.. (ld, )
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal (WEINSTEIN, ADAM)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Exhibit to #8 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion, CORRECTED EXHIBIT #1 by MRS. WORLD LLC. (GIANNETTA, PASQUALE)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec of Tana Johnson, #2 Statement Evidentiary Objection to Dec. of Alice Lee Giannetta)(WEINSTEIN, ADAM)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter (WEINSTEIN, ADAM)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, LEONARD STEINER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jc, )
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Leonard Steiner to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12222601.) (WEINSTEIN, ADAM)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by MRS. WORLD LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Alice Lee Giannetta, #2 Exhibit Christie v. National Institute for Newman Studies, #3 Exhibit press release, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GIANNETTA, PASQUALE)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by MRS. WORLD LLC re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GIANNETTA, PASQUALE)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF LEONARD STEINER, ESQ. IN SUPPORT TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANT TANA JOHNSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/1/2021. (ld, )
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Leonard Steiner by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec. of Steiner, #2 Text of Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order)(WEINSTEIN, ADAM)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal. Motions set for 3/15/2021 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal by All Defendants. Responses due by 3/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Dec. of Johnson, #3 Declaration Dec. of Steiner, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(WEINSTEIN, ADAM)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter by All Defendants. Responses due by 3/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WEINSTEIN, ADAM)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TANA JOHNSON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, Nature of Suit. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jc, )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TANA JOHNSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12005541) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MRS WORLD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GIANNETTA, PASQUALE)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MRS. WORLD LLC v. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRS WORLD, LLC
Represented By: PASQUALE F. GIANNETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRS. WORLD LLC
Represented By: PASQUALE F. GIANNETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TANA JOHNSON
Represented By: ADAM J. WEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?