MICELE v. WALMART et al
Plaintiff: ROXANNE MICELE, individually and as Administratrix Ad Prosequendum of the Estate of JEROME MICELE and ROXANNE MICELE
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10 (fictitious names), WALMART and JOHN DOES 1-10 (fictitious names)
Case Number: 2:2021cv01266
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Joseph A Dickson
2 Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint request dated 3/8/21, seeking a Telephone Conference concerning motions to add new parties before the Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for 4/29/21 at 10:30 a.m. (ECF No. 5). The parties' request is DENIED. Any motions to add new parties will be addressed at the Conference on 4/29/21. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 3/15/21. (jbb)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Raymond Carroll, plaintiff counsel. (CARROLL, RAYMOND)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER: Telephonic Initial Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 3/8/21. (jbb)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ROBERT M. KEALY terminated. Attorney RAYMOND S. CARROLL for ROXANNE MICELE added.. (CARROLL, RAYMOND)
February 19, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to the case. (wh)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by WALMART. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PETERS, NADA)
January 27, 2021 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (ps)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART from Hudson County, case number HUD-L-004035-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $402 receipt number ANJDC-1024988), filed by WALMART. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ps, ) Modified on 1/27/2021 (ps).
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART. (PETERS, NADA) Modified on 1/27/2021 (ps).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MICELE v. WALMART et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10 (fictitious names)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART
Represented By: NADA MAALOUF PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 (fictitious names)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROXANNE MICELE, individually and as Administratrix Ad Prosequendum of the Estate of JEROME MICELE
Represented By: ROBERT M. KEALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROXANNE MICELE
Represented By: ROBERT M. KEALY
Represented By: RAYMOND S. CARROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?