GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. TOTOWA CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT & PHYSICAL MEDICINE, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO. and GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: DAVID FONTANELLA, D.C., SPECIALTY MEDICAL SERVICES, L.L.C., JOSEPH HAYEK, D.C., SALVATORE MILAZZO, D.O., TOTOWA CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT & PHYSICAL MEDICINE, P.C., SALVATORE SANTANGELO, D.C., LOUIS GIASULLO, D.C. and CHERYL CRUZ, L.Ac.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02525
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/26/2021 at 11:00 AM before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 4/12/21. (LM, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CHERYL CRUZ, L.Ac., DAVID FONTANELLA, D.C., JOSEPH HAYEK, D.C., TOTOWA CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT & PHYSICAL MEDICINE, P.C..(ARIANS, E.)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by E. VICKI ARIANS on behalf of CHERYL CRUZ, L.Ac., DAVID FONTANELLA, D.C., JOSEPH HAYEK, D.C., TOTOWA CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT & PHYSICAL MEDICINE, P.C. (ARIANS, E.)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 25, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee for Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Steven Henesy, Esqs.: $ 450, receipt number NEW044333 (mfr)
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LOUIS GIASULLO, D.C., SALVATORE MILAZZO, D.O., SALVATORE SANTANGELO, D.C., SPECIALTY MEDICAL SERVICES, L.L.C.. (RANDOLPH, JEFFREY)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH on behalf of LOUIS GIASULLO, D.C., SALVATORE MILAZZO, D.O., SALVATORE SANTANGELO, D.C., SPECIALTY MEDICAL SERVICES, L.L.C. (RANDOLPH, JEFFREY)
March 18, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The #11 Application for Clerks order to extend time to answer submitted by SALVATORE MILAZZO, D.O., SPECIALTY MEDICAL SERVICES, L.L.C., SALVATORE SANTANGELO, D.C., LOUIS GIASULLO, D.C. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/19/2021. (lag, )
March 18, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the #11 Application for a Clerk's order to extend time to answer, filed by JEFFREY RANDOLPH on 3/18/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Consent Motion for extension of time to answer. The Consent Motion will be terminated, and the 6.1 application will be considered - such as it is - by the court. Additionally, this submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. For future filing of this nature, please select the event "Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer" found in the Other Documents menu. This message is for informational purposes only. (lag, )
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. CHERYL CRUZ, L.Ac. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021; SALVATORE SANTANGELO, D.C. served on 3/14/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; SPECIALTY MEDICAL SERVICES, L.L.C. served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Salvatore Santangelo, D.C., #2 Summons Returned Executed on Specialty Medical Services LLC, #3 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION and CONSENT ORDER for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise reply through 3/31/2021; Stipulation and order as to receipt of service of process for Cheryl Cruz, etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/16/2021. (lag, )
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by CHERYL CRUZ, L.Ac., DAVID FONTANELLA, D.C., JOSEPH HAYEK, D.C., TOTOWA CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT & PHYSICAL MEDICINE, P.C.. (ARIANS, E.)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Steven Henesy, etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/1/2021. (lag, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Steven Henesy by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu Brief Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 7.1(d)(4), #2 Certification of Gene Y. Kang, #3 Certification of Barry I. Levy, #4 Certification of Max Gershenoff, #5 Certification of Steven Henesy, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
February 26, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Steven Henesy. Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. DAVID FONTANELLA, D.C. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021; LOUIS GIASULLO, D.C. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021; JOSEPH HAYEK, D.C. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021; SALVATORE MILAZZO, D.O. served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021; TOTOWA CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT & PHYSICAL MEDICINE, P.C. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Joseph Hayek, D.C., #2 Summons Returned Executed on Louis Giasullo, D.C., #3 Summons Returned Executed on Salvatore Milazzo, D.O., #4 Summons Returned Executed on Totowa Center for Pain Management & Physical Medicine, P.C., #5 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHERYL CRUZ, L.Ac., DAVID FONTANELLA, D.C., LOUIS GIASULLO, D.C., JOSEPH HAYEK, D.C., SALVATORE MILAZZO, D.O., SALVATORE SANTANGELO, D.C., SPECIALTY MEDICAL SERVICES, L.L.C., TOTOWA CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT & PHYSICAL MEDICINE, P.C.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KANG, GENE)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHERYL CRUZ, L.Ac., DAVID FONTANELLA, D.C., LOUIS GIASULLO, D.C., JOSEPH HAYEK, D.C., SALVATORE MILAZZO, D.O., SALVATORE SANTANGELO, D.C., SPECIALTY MEDICAL SERVICES, L.L.C., TOTOWA CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT & PHYSICAL MEDICINE, P.C. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12122961) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2", #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KANG, GENE)
February 12, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. TOTOWA CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT & PHYSICAL MEDICINE, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID FONTANELLA, D.C.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALTY MEDICAL SERVICES, L.L.C.
Represented By: JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH HAYEK, D.C.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALVATORE MILAZZO, D.O.
Represented By: JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTOWA CENTER FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT & PHYSICAL MEDICINE, P.C.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALVATORE SANTANGELO, D.C.
Represented By: JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS GIASULLO, D.C.
Represented By: JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL CRUZ, L.Ac.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?