Milburn v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeanette Milburn
Defendant: JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, Ortho-McNeilJanssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, OrthoMcNeil Pharmaceuticals, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC and ABC CORPORATION #1-20
In Re: ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv02825
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Member Case Transferred in on 2/18/21 from the Eastern District of Kentucky 3:21-00004 for MDL 2973 ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, )
February 18, 2021 This case is part of MDL2973. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found #Here (gh, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
February 18, 2021 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (gh, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 12 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00004. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 17, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER received from District of New Jersey re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 6, filed in MDL Case Number 2973. (Attachments: #1 Elmiron Request File Letter)(MJY)cc: COR
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER-06: MDL No. 2973 for Transfer to District of New Jersey. (MJY)
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeanette Milburn via Certified Mail to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Human, Kenneth)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson; Summons issued and returned to counsel w/ service packet by U.S. Mail for service by Kentucky Seretary of State. (CBD)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Jeanette Milburn re #6 Summons Returned Unexecuted on Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Summons unexecuted)(Human, Kenneth)
February 3, 2021 Clerk's Note re #6 Summons Returned Unexecuted: Clerk is unable to issue amended summons. Counsel's office was advised of steps to cure deficiency with returned summons. (CBD)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jeanette Milburn as to Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons AMENDED SUMMONS TO JOHNSON & JOHNSON)(Human, Kenneth)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Janssen Ortho LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel with service packet by U.S. Mail for service by Kentucky Secretary of State. (CBD)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, OrthoMcNeil Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service by Registered Mail. (CBD)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING by Jeanette Milburn Summonses on Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Human, Kenneth)
January 29, 2021 Clerk's Note re #1 Complaint: Clerk notified JPML,SKV as potentially related to MDL 2973. (CBD)
January 29, 2021 Clerk's Note re #1 Complaint: Clerk is unable to issue summons as presented. Summons were not presented in proper form. (CBD)
January 29, 2021 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4883182), filed by Jeanette Milburn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milburn v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN ORTHO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeilJanssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OrthoMcNeil Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION #1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Milburn
Represented By: Joshua Hicks
Represented By: Gregory Michael Funfsinn
Represented By: Kenneth Carlos Human
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?