GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. KOPPEL, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO. and GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: BRIAN BEAGIN, D.C., CLIFTON PAIN AND REHAB LLC, VINCENT SARACENO, D.C., NEWARK PAIN AND REHAB CENTER LLC, DAVID ALLEN KRESHOVER, D.C., SPINECARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER, P.A., GARDEN STATE PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.A., RICHARD INACIO, D.C., TODD KOPPEL, M.D. and CAPITAL CHIROPRACTIC, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03413
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER - Rescheduling a Telephone Conference from 4/28/2021 at 10:00 am to 4/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. At the allotted time, counsel shall dial (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/19/2021. (kd)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER - A telephone conference is set for 4/28/2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. At the allotted time, counsel are to dial (888) 684-8852, code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/19/2021. (rn)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Letter from Plaintiffs to the Hon. Leda D. Wettre, U.S.M.J. re #20 Letter. (KANG, GENE)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter from Defendants requesting motion. (BERGWALL, THOMAS)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER ORDER - A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 6/17/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. At the allotted time, counsel shall dial (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/13/2021. (kd)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Request for Default by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. against Defendant Clifton Pain and Rehab LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Cover Letter to Clerk of Court, #3 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by RICHARD INACIO, D.C., NEWARK PAIN AND REHAB CENTER LLC, VINCENT SARACENO, D.C., SPINECARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER, P.A..(RANDOLPH, JEFFREY)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Clifton Pain and Rehab LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ams, )
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 450, receipt number NEW044409 as to Barry Levy, Max Gershenoff and Blythe C. Miller. (ams, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendants David Allen Kreshover, D.C. and Capital Chiropractic, P.C. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 5/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/5/2021. (ams, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS ANTHONY TELESCA on behalf of CAPITAL CHIROPRACTIC, P.C., DAVID ALLEN KRESHOVER, D.C. (TELESCA, THOMAS)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint)(TELESCA, THOMAS)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. CAPITAL CHIROPRACTIC, P.C. served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021; DAVID ALLEN KRESHOVER, D.C. served on 3/20/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed On David Allen Kreshover, D.C., #2 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendants, Todd Koppel, M.D. and Garden State Pain Management P.A., to reply or to otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 4/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/31/2021. (ams, )
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO REPLY by GARDEN STATE PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.A., TODD KOPPEL, M.D.. (BERGWALL, THOMAS)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P. BERGWALL on behalf of GARDEN STATE PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.A., TODD KOPPEL, M.D. (BERGWALL, THOMAS)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. TODD KOPPEL, M.D. served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #8 Application 6.1 filed by Jeffrey Randolph on 3/24/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Application/Petition. In the future, please use the event "Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order" found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ams, )
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by RICHARD INACIO, D.C., SPINECARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER, P.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/15/2021. (ams, )
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of time to Answer Complaint for by RICHARD INACIO, D.C., SPINECARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER, P.A.. (RANDOLPH, JEFFREY)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH on behalf of RICHARD INACIO, D.C., SPINECARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER, P.A. (RANDOLPH, JEFFREY)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Blythe C. Miller, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/23/2021. (ams, )
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. CLIFTON PAIN AND REHAB LLC served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; GARDEN STATE PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.A. served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; RICHARD INACIO, D.C. served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; NEWARK PAIN AND REHAB CENTER LLC served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021; VINCENT SARACENO, D.C. served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; SPINECARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER, P.A. served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Richard Inacio, D.C., #2 Summons Returned Executed on Spinecare Chiropractic Rehab Center, P.A., #3 Summons Returned Executed on Clifton Pain and Rehab LLC, #4 Summons Returned Executed on Vincent Saraceno, D.C., #5 Summons Returned Executed on Newark Pain and Rehab Center LLC, #6 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Blythe C. Miller by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu Brief Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 7.1(d)(4), #2 Certification of Gene Y. Kang, #3 Certification of Barry I. Levy, #4 Certification of Max Gershenoff, #5 Certification of Blythe C. Miller, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Blythe C. Miller. Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRIAN BEAGIN, D.C., CAPITAL CHIROPRACTIC, P.C., CLIFTON PAIN AND REHAB LLC, GARDEN STATE PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.A., RICHARD INACIO, D.C., TODD KOPPEL, M.D., DAVID ALLEN KRESHOVER, D.C., NEWARK PAIN AND REHAB CENTER LLC, VINCENT SARACENO, D.C., SPINECARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER, P.A.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KANG, GENE)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIAN BEAGIN, D.C., CAPITAL CHIROPRACTIC, P.C., CLIFTON PAIN AND REHAB LLC, GARDEN STATE PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.A., RICHARD INACIO, D.C., TODD KOPPEL, M.D., DAVID ALLEN KRESHOVER, D.C., NEWARK PAIN AND REHAB CENTER LLC, VINCENT SARACENO, D.C., SPINECARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER, P.A. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12185303) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2", #3 Exhibit "3", #4 Exhibit "4", #5 Exhibit "5", #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(KANG, GENE)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. KOPPEL, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN BEAGIN, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLIFTON PAIN AND REHAB LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT SARACENO, D.C.
Represented By: JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWARK PAIN AND REHAB CENTER LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID ALLEN KRESHOVER, D.C.
Represented By: THOMAS ANTHONY TELESCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPINECARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER, P.A.
Represented By: JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDEN STATE PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.A.
Represented By: THOMAS P. BERGWALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD INACIO, D.C.
Represented By: JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD KOPPEL, M.D.
Represented By: THOMAS P. BERGWALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL CHIROPRACTIC, P.C.
Represented By: THOMAS ANTHONY TELESCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?