PARKS v. MCCORMAC et al
Plaintiff: NIJEER PARKS
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS, PETER NATASI, JOHN E. MCCORMAC, ANDREW LYSZK, ROBERT HUBNER, JOHN AND JANE DOES (1-20), JOSEPH LICCIARDI, CHRISTOPHER KUBERIET and Township of Woodbridge
Cross Claimant: MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Cross Defendant: IDEMIA, INC.
Interested Party: MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Case Number: 2:2021cv04021
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
2 Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 LETTER ORDER the Court hereby STAYS all remaining discovery in this action pending adjudication of the Motion to Dismiss #80 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/26/2023. (sm)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 TEXT ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff not having appeared for the telephone conference on May 4, 2023, the conference is rescheduled to May 23, 2023 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/4/23. (LM, )
April 13, 2023 Filing 97 Letter from Fredrick L. Rubenstein regarding parties respective positions pertaining to prosecutors' depositions. (RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 LETTER ORDER granting Woodbridge Defendants' request for an extension to 4/10/2023 to submit its position statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/4/2023. (sm)
April 3, 2023 Filing 95 Letter from Fredrick L. Rubenstein requesting extension to serve position papers. (RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER that on or before April 3, 2023, counsel for the Woodbridge Defendants and Middlesex County Prosecutor Defendants shall file with the Court a joint letter setting forth their respective positions on the proposed depositions of defendants Kuberiet and Nastasi; Counsel shall appear for a telephonic conference before the undersigned on May 4, 2023 at 4:00 p.m.; given the upcoming May 4, 2023 conference, the telephone conference previously set for June 5, 2023 before the undersigned is cancelled; the Woodbridge Defendants time to serve expert reports is extended without date pending adjudication of the issue concerning the proposed depositions of the Middlesex County Prosecutors. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/27/2023. (sm)
March 27, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Settlement Conference held on 3/27/2023. (LM, )
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/13/2023. (mxw)
March 13, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 3/13/2023. (LM, )
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that the telephonic conference previously set for 2/23/2023 before the undersigned is rescheduled to 3/13/2023 at 4:00 p.m.; Plaintiffs time to serve his expert report is extended through the 3/13/2023 telephonic conference, during which the Court will address the expert discovery schedule with all counsel; the settlement conference set for 3/27/2023 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned shall proceed as scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/22/2023. (sm)
February 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TEXT ORDER The stay of discovery as to defendants Kuberiet and Nastasi granted by the Order at ECF No. 31 remains in effect until their motion to dismiss is decided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/18/23. (Wettre, Leda)
February 15, 2023 Filing 90 Letter from Prosecutor Defendants. (MEYERS, PHOENIX)
February 10, 2023 Filing 89 Letter from Daniel Sexton (for plaintiff) in support of leave to depose Kuberiet and Nastasi. (SEXTON, DANIEL)
January 30, 2023 Filing 88 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CHRISTOPHER KUBERIET, PETER NATASI re #80 MOTION to Dismiss (MEYERS, PHOENIX)
January 26, 2023 Filing 87 Letter from Prosecutor Defendants. (MEYERS, PHOENIX)
January 24, 2023 Filing 86 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #80 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(SEXTON, DANIEL)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's time to serve his expert report, currently due February 14, 2023, is hereby extended through the February 23, 2023 telephone conference before the undersigned, during which the Court will discuss further the request with all counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/23/23. (LM, )
January 20, 2023 Filing 84 Letter from Daniel Sexton (for plaintiff) seeking extension of time for experts with consent of all parties. (SEXTON, DANIEL)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the letter from counsel for the Woodbridge Defendants at ECF No. 82. Counsel for the Prosecutor Defendants shall file a letter in response on or before January 25, 2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/28/23. (LM, )
January 17, 2023 Filing 82 Letter from Fredrick L. Rubenstein requesting leave to file Motion to Compel Prosecutors' Depositions. (RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK)
January 6, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #80 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/6/2023 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
January 5, 2023 Filing 81 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #80 MOTION to Dismiss . (SEXTON, DANIEL)
December 23, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #80 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 1/17/2023 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
December 19, 2022 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss by CHRISTOPHER KUBERIET, PETER NATASI. (MEYERS, PHOENIX)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER that fact discovery is extended through 1/31/2023; that the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on 2/23/2023 at 4:00 p.m.; the parties shall appear for a settlement conference on 3/27/2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/30/2022. (sm)
November 29, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 11/29/2022. (LM, )
November 22, 2022 Filing 78 Letter from all parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit This exhibit of Plaintiff to the joint letter details the discovery dispute. Note that it was not sent until this evening because of a clerical error.)(SEXTON, DANIEL)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER terminating #60 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/7/2022. (sm)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 VOLUNTARY STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, MIDDLESEX COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS ONLY and without attorneys' fees and costs as to any parties. MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS terminated. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 11/4/2022. (sm)
November 3, 2022 Filing 75 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (DVORAK, LORI)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER Plaintiff's counsel shall advise by letter to the Court on or before November 4, 2022 whether the motion to compel at ECF 60 has been resolved. If it has not, plaintiff is to specify what portion of the motion to compel remains unresolved. If nothing is received by November 4, 2022, the Court shall terminate the motion to compel without prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/31/2022. (Wettre, Leda)
October 14, 2022 Filing 73 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by ROBERT HUBNER, JOSEPH LICCIARDI, ANDREW LYSZK, JOHN E. MCCORMAC, TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE.(RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK)
October 7, 2022 Filing 72 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) Complaint per Order of the Court against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by NIJEER PARKS.(SEXTON, DANIEL)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference before the undersigned on November 29, 2022 at 4:30 p.m. Counsel shall submit concise status letters to the Court no later than one week in advance of the conference. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/4/22. (LM, )
October 3, 2022 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE re #60 First MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters to D. Sexton regarding document production)(NIGRO, PATRICIA)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that Plaintiffs request to name Woodbridge Police Santiago Tapia as a defendant in this action is DENIED; Plaintiffs request to amend the Complaint to add new factual allegations, which were revealed through discovery produced after the deadline to amend pleadings, is GRANTED; plaintiff may amend the Complaint to clarify the use of the word department to refer either to the Middlesex Department of Corrections or the Woodbridge Police Department; the Clerk of Court is requested to terminate the motion at ECF No. 43. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/3/2022. (sm)
October 3, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 10/3/2022. (ECR/ATT) (LM, )
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/29/2022. (sm)
September 29, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #60 First MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum. Motion set for 10/17/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 LETTER ORDER granting a one cycle adjournment of the Motion to Compel #60 making it returnable 10/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/28/2022. (sm)
September 21, 2022 Filing 66 Letter from all parties as to status of discovery. (SEXTON, DANIEL)
September 16, 2022 Filing 65 Letter from Patricia Nigro, DAG. (NIGRO, PATRICIA)
September 16, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA MARIE NIGRO on behalf of MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE (NIGRO, PATRICIA)
September 16, 2022 Filing 63 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney PHOENIX NICOLE MEYERS terminated. Attorney PETER SOSINSKI for CHRISTOPHER KUBERIET,PETER SOSINSKI for PETER NATASI added.. (SOSINSKI, PETER)
September 9, 2022 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS re #59 RESPONSE in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #43 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint per Order of the Court. (DVORAK, LORI) Modified on 9/12/2022 (ams, ).
September 9, 2022 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ROBERT HUBNER, JOSEPH LICCIARDI, ANDREW LYSZK, JOHN E. MCCORMAC, TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE re #59 RESPONSE in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #43 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint per Order of the Court. (RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK) Modified on 9/12/2022 (ams, ).
September 7, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #60 First MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum. Motion set for 10/3/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
September 6, 2022 Filing 60 First MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum by NIJEER PARKS. (Attachments: #1 Brief w Exhibits A, B, C. D, #2 Affidavit relating to service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SEXTON, DANIEL)
August 31, 2022 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #43 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint per Order of the Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit text order, #2 Exhibit revised proposed amended complain)(SEXTON, DANIEL)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re: #56 discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/29/2022. (sm)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TEXT ORDER: The Court having considered the parties' submissions on plaintiff's Motion to Amend (ECF Nos, 43, 46, 47), and the Court having found that the motion papers do not adequately address certain issues, plaintiff shall submit a supplemental letter brief of no longer than 3 pages on or before September 1, 2022, addressing the viability of his request to amend the factual allegations relating to a Monell claim without having sought to name the Township of Woodbridge as a defendant, and defendants shall file responsive letters of no longer than three pages on or before September 9, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/24/22. (LM, )
August 19, 2022 Filing 56 Letter from Plaintiff with contributions of all parties for joint letter. (SEXTON, DANIEL)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is set for October 3, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/19/22. (LM, )
August 15, 2022 Filing 54 Letter from Daniel Sexton (for plaintiff) asking for a ruling for tomorrow's depostions. (SEXTON, DANIEL)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is set for August 22, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/7/22. (LM, )
July 5, 2022 Filing 52 STATUS REPORT by ROBERT HUBNER, JOSEPH LICCIARDI, ANDREW LYSZK, JOHN E. MCCORMAC, TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE. (RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER, Motions terminated: In the interest of efficient case management, Defendants Motions to Dismiss [ECF No. 19] and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [ECF No. 24] is hereby administratively terminated pending resolution of Plaintiffs Second Motion to Amend [ECF No. 43]. Should the Motion to Amend be denied, Defendants may refile their motions at that time.So Ordered by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 6/30/2022. (kd)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/29/2022. (ld, )
June 29, 2022 Filing 49 Letter from Prosecutor Defendants. (MEYERS, PHOENIX)
June 29, 2022 Filing 48 Letter from Prosecutor Defendants. (MEYERS, PHOENIX)
June 7, 2022 Filing 47 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ROBERT HUBNER, JOSEPH LICCIARDI, ANDREW LYSZK, JOHN E. MCCORMAC, TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE re #43 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint per Order of the Court (RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK)
June 7, 2022 Filing 46 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS re #43 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint per Order of the Court (DVORAK, LORI)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ORDER: The Court having reviewed counsels correspondence regarding outstanding Monell discovery (ECF No. 44), plaintiff is hereby ordered to file a letter on or before June 17, 2022 updating the Court as to whether the parties have consensually resolved the issue via a confidentiality agreement. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/3/22. (LM, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 44 Letter from Daniel Sexton (for plaintiff). (SEXTON, DANIEL)
May 27, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #43 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint per Order of the Court. Motion set for 6/21/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
May 26, 2022 Filing 43 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint per Order of the Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit to brief)(SEXTON, DANIEL)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/4/2022. (sm)
May 4, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 5/4/2022. (LM, )
April 27, 2022 Filing 41 Letter from Daniel Sexton (for plaintiff). (SEXTON, DANIEL)
April 27, 2022 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT JOINTLY ON BEHALF OF ALL PARTIES by MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (DVORAK, LORI)
February 28, 2022 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Supplemental Letter brief in Oppostion (SEXTON, DANIEL)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER that fact discovery is extended through 4/29/2022; the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on 5/4/2022 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/25/2022. (sm)
January 25, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 1/25/2022. (LM, )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is set for January 25, 2022 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/4/21. (LM, )
November 3, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 11/3/2021. (LM, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 36 Letter from Daniel Sexton (for plaintiff) re status. (SEXTON, DANIEL)
October 29, 2021 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT by MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (DVORAK, LORI)
October 28, 2021 Filing 34 STATUS REPORT by ROBERT HUBNER, JOSEPH LICCIARDI, ANDREW LYSZK, JOHN E. MCCORMAC, TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE. (RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK)
August 24, 2021 Filing 33 BRIEF in Opposition filed by NIJEER PARKS re #24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (SEXTON, DANIEL)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/11/2021. (sm)
August 5, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #19 MOTION to Dismiss (SEXTON, DANIEL)
August 5, 2021 Filing 29 Letter from Daniel Sexton (for plaintiff) regarding status of Joint Discovery Order and proposing new dates.. (SEXTON, DANIEL)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that the request of defendants Kuberiet and Nastasi for a stay of discovery during the pendency of their motion to dismiss #19 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/4/2021. (sm)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER - Plaintiff's request #27 to adjourn the original return date of the dispositive motion filed by the Woodbridge defendants is Granted. The Motion Date will now be August 24, 2021.So Ordered by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 8/3/2021. (kd)
August 2, 2021 Filing 27 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (SEXTON, DANIEL)
July 27, 2021 Filing 26 Letter from Defendants Kuberiet and Nastasi Requesting a Stay of Discovery. (MEYERS, PHOENIX)
July 26, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CHRISTOPHER KUBERIET re #19 MOTION to Dismiss (MEYERS, PHOENIX)
July 26, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 8/16/2021 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by JOSEPH LICCIARDI, JOHN E. MCCORMAC. Responses due by 8/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certification Certification of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Brief, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK)
July 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 7/21/2021. (smf, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 23 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #19 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 proposed order denying application)(SEXTON, DANIEL)
July 16, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Second CROSSCLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTION against IDEMIA, INC. by MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS.(DVORAK, LORI)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals for all further proceedings. Judge Madeline Cox Arleo no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/30/21. (ak, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 20 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss . (SEXTON, DANIEL)
June 24, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by CHRISTOPHER KUBERIET. (MEYERS, PHOENIX)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER - Rescheduling a Telephone Conference from 7/15/2021 to 7/21/2021 at 4:30 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. At the allotted time, counsel shall dial (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/11/2021. (kd)
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ROBERT HUBNER, JOSEPH LICCIARDI, ANDREW LYSZK, JOHN E. MCCORMAC, TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT per text order signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/27/21. against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by NIJEER PARKS.(SEXTON, DANIEL)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Defendants having consented to the filing of a proposed Second Amended Complaint, Plaintiff shall file his amended pleading within 5 days. #9 Defendant's motion to dismiss is terminated without prejudice to refiling against the forthcoming pleading. Telephone Conference scheduled for July 15, 2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/27/21. (jc, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Daniel Sexton, Counsel for plaintiff, advising that defendants have consented to filing of Second Amended Complaint. (SEXTON, DANIEL)
May 18, 2021 Filing 13 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JORDYNN JACKSON terminated. Attorney PHOENIX NICOLE MEYERS for CHRISTOPHER KUBERIET added.. (MEYERS, PHOENIX)
May 12, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 5/12/2021. (kd)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER As discussed with counsel at today's status conference, plaintiff's counsel shall provide a proposed Amended Complaint to defense counsel on or before May 14, 2021, defense counsel shall advise plaintiff's counsel on or before May 21, 2021 whether they consent to the filing of same, and counsel shall advise the Court of the outcome of those discussions on or before May 24, 2021. Pending a determination as to whether an Amended Complaint will be filed, plaintiff's time to respond to the motion to dismiss at ECF No. 9 is hereby extended. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/12/2021. (Wettre, Leda)
April 29, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION to Dismiss fof Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 5/12/2021 at 3:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. At the allotted time, counsel shall dial (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/28/2021. (kd)
April 28, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Scheduling Conference held on 4/28/2021. (kd)
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Daniel Sexton (for plaintiff) re Intial Conference on 4/28/21. (SEXTON, DANIEL)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CHRISTOPHER KUBERIET. Responses due by 4/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Statement Notice of Motion, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Brief, #4 Certification of Counsel, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit A)(JACKSON, JORDYNN) Modified on 4/29/2021 (bt, ). Modified on 4/29/2021 (bt, ).
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 Joint Discovery Plan by MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS.(DVORAK, LORI)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (DVORAK, LORI)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against IDEMIA, INC. by MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS.(DVORAK, LORI)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JORDYNN JACKSON on behalf of CHRISTOPHER KUBERIET (JACKSON, JORDYNN)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER - A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 4/28/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. At the allotted time, counsel shall dial (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/31/2021. (kd)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ROBERT HUBNER, JOSEPH LICCIARDI, ANDREW LYSZK, JOHN E. MCCORMAC, Township of Woodbridge. (Attachments: #1 Answer)(RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by LORI A. DVORAK on behalf of MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (DVORAK, LORI)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ANDREW LYSZK, ROBERT HUBNER, JOSEPH LICCIARDI, JOHN E. MCCORMAC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Passaic County, case number PAS L 003672 20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12223128), filed by ANDREW LYSZK, ROBERT HUBNER, JOSEPH LICCIARDI, JOHN E. MCCORMAC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certification OF COUNSEL, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(RUBENSTEIN, FREDRICK)
March 3, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARKS v. MCCORMAC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER NATASI
Represented By: PETER SOSINSKI
Represented By: PHOENIX NICOLE MEYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN E. MCCORMAC
Represented By: FREDRICK L. RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW LYSZK
Represented By: FREDRICK L. RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT HUBNER
Represented By: FREDRICK L. RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES (1-20)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH LICCIARDI
Represented By: FREDRICK L. RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER KUBERIET
Represented By: JORDYNN JACKSON
Represented By: PHOENIX NICOLE MEYERS
Represented By: PETER SOSINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township of Woodbridge
Represented By: FREDRICK L. RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: MIDDLESEX DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: LORI A. DVORAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIJEER PARKS
Represented By: DANIEL W. SEXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: IDEMIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Represented By: PATRICIA MARIE NIGRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?