SIACI SAINT HONORE v. M/V MSC MARIA ELENA et al
Plaintiff: SIACI SAINT HONORE
Defendant: MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC., M/V MSC MARIA ELENA and EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04620
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS C. MARTIN on behalf of EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Crossclaim by EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC..(MARTIN, THOMAS)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTIN ROY WEST, II on behalf of M/V MSC MARIA ELENA (WEST, MARTIN)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MSC MARIA ELENA for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (bt, )
April 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #9 Response (NOT Motion). (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Request for Default. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Certification)(WEST, MARTIN)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Request for Default by SIACI SAINT HONORE against Defendant Motor Vessel MSC MARIA ELENA. (Attachments: #1 Certification In Support of Pl. Request For Entry Of Defauolt)(BARROW, TIMOTHY)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Our records indicate that proof of service has been filed in this civil action and that the time for defendant, M/V MSC Maria Elena to answer has expired. You are hereby directed to move this civil action by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to Answer out of time within fourteen (14) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on April 22, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 04/08/2021. (lr, )
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A..(WEST, MARTIN)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (WEST, MARTIN)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIACI SAINT HONORE. M/V MSC MARIA ELENA served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. (bt, )
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., M/V MSC MARIA ELENA, MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIACI SAINT HONORE. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., M/V MSC MARIA ELENA, MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12247296), filed by SIACI SAINT HONORE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BARROW, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIACI SAINT HONORE v. M/V MSC MARIA ELENA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.
Represented By: MARTIN ROY WEST, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MSC MARIA ELENA
Represented By: MARTIN ROY WEST, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIACI SAINT HONORE
Represented By: TIMOTHY DONALD BARROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?