GOULD v. JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: JONATHAN GOULD
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., JP MORGAN CHASE & CO. and Corporations 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv04663
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint / Reply Memorandum of Law In Further Support Of Motion To Dismiss (KANDEL, TYLER)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. is dropped as a defendant from this matter; Discovery is stayed and the initial scheduling conference is adjourned pending resolution of the #5 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 4/21/2021. (ams, )
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/21/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, )
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed plaintiff's letter filed on April 14, 2021 (ECF No. #11 ), which requests that the initial scheduling conference set for April 21, 2021 be adjourned, and that the deadline to submit a joint discovery plan be extended. The initial scheduling conference is converted to a telephone status conference, which shall proceed on April 21, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383. The parties are not required to submit a joint discovery plan or joint status letter in advance of the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 4/16/2021. (as, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from Plaintiff's Attorney. (ZWEIG, STEVEN)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JONATHAN GOULD re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Gould, #2 Declaration Declaration of Steven Zweig)(ZWEIG, STEVEN)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter re adjournment of motion date. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/6/2021. (ams, )
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 5/3/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter from Tyler J. Kandel re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (KANDEL, TYLER)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (WATSON, LAUREN)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on April 21, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here . Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/18/2021. (as, )
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kandel Declaration in Support of Motion To Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Filed Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 3 - Rockwell Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of JPMorgan 10K, #6 Exhibit 5 - Related Action Complaint and Amd Complaint, #7 Exhibit 6 - Related Action Docket Report, #8 Exhibit 7 - Related Action Deadlines and Hearings, #9 Exhibit 8 - Memo in Support of Plainitf's Motion to Compel, #10 Exhibit 9 - 11.27.18 Letter from Shanies to Riemer, #11 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(KANDEL, TYLER)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 4/19/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CORPORATIONS 1-10, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. re #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty), #1 Notice of Removal,, (WATSON, LAUREN)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent.. (WATSON, LAUREN)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN WATSON on behalf of Corporations 1-10, JPMorgan Chase & Co.,, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (WATSON, LAUREN)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Corporations 1-10, JPMorgan Chase & Co., from New Jersey Superior Court Essex County, case number ESX-L-000929-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12249051), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Corporations 1-10, JPMorgan Chase & Co.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Related Action Complaints, #3 Exhibit C - JPMorgan Chase Bank - Articles of Association, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpt of JPMorgan 10K, #5 Exhibit E - Rockwell Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - Statement of Damages)(KANDEL, TYLER)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOULD v. JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: TYLER JAY KANDEL
Represented By: LAUREN WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.
Represented By: TYLER JAY KANDEL
Represented By: LAUREN WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations 1-10
Represented By: TYLER JAY KANDEL
Represented By: LAUREN WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN GOULD
Represented By: STEVEN JEFFREY ZWEIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?