RAJPATH USA LLC et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Plaintiff: HINALBEN BHARATKUMAR PATEL, RAMNJIBHAI UKANI and RAJPATH USA LLC
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2021cv04800
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: In view of plaintiffs' notice of withdrawal (ECF No. #19 ), the motion for an order to show cause (ECF No. #3 ) is administratively terminated as withdrawn. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/7/2021. (as, )
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on June 1, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 4/30/2021. (as, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Application for an Order Requiring USCIS to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and for Expedited Hearing (BHAGWATI, RITHVICK)
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 BRIEF in Opposition filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, November 4, 2016 AAO Decision)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Defendant's Letter, ORDERED that Defendants time to file an Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is extended from 4/19/2021 to 4/23/2021. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/19/2021. (bt, )
April 18, 2021 Filing 16 Letter from AUSA Hajdarpasic Regarding Extension Request. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
April 13, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee: $150.00. Receipt number NEW044463 for Michael Piston, Esq. (ps) Modified on 4/14/2021 (ps).
April 5, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ENES HAJDARPASIC on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #10 Defendant's Letter, Defendants time to file an opposition to Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction is extended until 4/19/2021. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/1/2021. (bt, )
March 29, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/19/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of MICHAEL E. PISTON, ESQ etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/26/2021. (bt, )
March 26, 2021 Filing 12 Amended Document re #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice" by All Plaintiffs. (BHAGWATI, RITHVICK) Modified on 3/29/2021 (bt, ).
March 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed PHV Order, #3 Certification Certificate of Good Standing)(BHAGWATI, RITHVICK)
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from AUSA Hajdarpasic Regarding Extension Request. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ENES HAJDARPASIC on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAJPATH USA LLC, HINALBEN BHARATKUMAR PATEL, RAMNJIBHAI UKANI. All Defendants., SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAJPATH USA LLC, HINALBEN BHARATKUMAR PATEL, RAMNJIBHAI UKANI. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons sent to USCIS)(BHAGWATI, RITHVICK)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAJPATH USA LLC, HINALBEN BHARATKUMAR PATEL, RAMNJIBHAI UKANI. All Defendants., SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAJPATH USA LLC, HINALBEN BHARATKUMAR PATEL, RAMNJIBHAI UKANI. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons sent to US Attorney General)(BHAGWATI, RITHVICK)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAJPATH USA LLC, HINALBEN BHARATKUMAR PATEL, RAMNJIBHAI UKANI. All Defendants., SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAJPATH USA LLC, HINALBEN BHARATKUMAR PATEL, RAMNJIBHAI UKANI. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons sent to USCIS)(BHAGWATI, RITHVICK)
March 15, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause . Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The motion for pro hac vice admission (ECF No. #2 ) is denied without prejudice, because (1) the declaration of the applicant seeking admission lacks a handwritten signature, which is required for submissions by non-admitted attorneys in the District of New Jersey, (2) the applicant does not certify that no disciplinary proceedings of any sort (as opposed to suspension or disbarment proceedings only) are pending and no discipline of any sort (as opposed to suspension or disbarment only) has previously been imposed in any jurisdiction, and (3) although the applicant discloses several bars in which the applicant is a member in good standing, the statement lacks the names and addresses of the officials or offices maintaining all of the rolls of the members of the bars or, in lieu thereof, certificates of good standing issued by those maintaining such rolls. Leave is hereby granted for a new motion to be filed that is in accordance with Local Civil Rule 101.1(c), Local Civil Rule 5.2(12)(b), and paragraph 5 of Judge Kiel's Civil Case Management Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/15/2021. (as, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Order to Show Cause by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause, #3 Statement Statement of Facts, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(BHAGWATI, RITHVICK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification Certificate of Good Standing)(BHAGWATI, RITHVICK)
March 11, 2021 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12253176), filed by RAJPATH USA LLC, HINALBEN BHARATKUMAR PATEL, RAMNJIBHAI UKANI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit)(BHAGWATI, RITHVICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAJPATH USA LLC et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HINALBEN BHARATKUMAR PATEL
Represented By: RITHVICK BHAGWATI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMNJIBHAI UKANI
Represented By: RITHVICK BHAGWATI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAJPATH USA LLC
Represented By: RITHVICK BHAGWATI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?