TOZZI v. PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.
Plaintiff: MARK TOZZI
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.
Case Number: 2:2021cv08727
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARK TOZZI. PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP. served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (WIETZKE, MARC)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS MINO on behalf of PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP. (MINO, NICHOLAS)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting an Extension of Time to June 16, 2021 to Respond re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/5/2021. (ld, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Thomas R. Brophy, Esq. to Hon. Jessica S. Allen Requesting Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. (BROPHY, THOMAS)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS ROBERT BROPHY on behalf of PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP. (BROPHY, THOMAS)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
April 12, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to the case. (ak, )
April 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12354508) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARK TOZZI. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WIETZKE, MARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOZZI v. PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK TOZZI
Represented By: MARC T. WIETZKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.
Represented By: THOMAS ROBERT BROPHY
Represented By: NICHOLAS MINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?