PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC. v. AMERICAN SOCIETY OF ANESTHESIOLOGISTS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.
Defendant: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF ANESTHESIOLOGISTS, INC., NASIR HUSSAIN, BRENDAN SHEEHY, JAMES C. EISENACH, MARY ELLEN McCANN, DAVID L. STAHL, FARAJ W. ABDALLAH, TRISTAN E. WEAVER, BRIAN M. ILFELD, RODNEY A. GABRIEL, RICHARD BRULL, EVAN D. KHARASCH and MICHAEL K. ESSANDOH
Case Number: 2:2021cv09264
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
2 Judge: James B Clark
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J. requesting stay of discovery and expedited hearing date re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #58 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6). (MARINO, KEVIN)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by FARAJ W. ABDALLAH, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF ANESTHESIOLOGISTS, INC., RICHARD BRULL, JAMES C. EISENACH, RODNEY A. GABRIEL, BRIAN M. ILFELD, EVAN D. KHARASCH, MARY ELLEN McCANN. Responses due by 6/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Kevin H. Marino, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MARINO, KEVIN)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by FARAJ W. ABDALLAH, RICHARD BRULL, JAMES C. EISENACH, RODNEY A. GABRIEL, BRIAN M. ILFELD, MARY ELLEN McCANN. Responses due by 6/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MARINO, KEVIN)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Letter from Corinne McCann Trainor to the Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J. and the Hon. Jessica S. Allen, U.S.M.J. re #40 Scheduling Order, #43 Transcript,,,. (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MICHAEL K. ESSANDOH, NASIR HUSSAIN, BRENDAN SHEEHY, DAVID L. STAHL, TRISTAN E. WEAVER. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Michael K. Essandoh, #3 Declaration of Nasir Hussain, #4 Declaration of Brendan Sheehy, #5 Declaration of David L. Stahl, #6 Declaration of Tristan E. Weaver, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(TRAINOR, CORINNE)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF ANESTHESIOLOGISTS, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (MARINO, KEVIN)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Seal, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/10/2021. (ams, )
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #51 MOTION to Seal certain portions of Pacira's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REDACTION to #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7- [REDACTED], #2 Exhibit 8- [REDACTED], #3 Exhibit 13- [REDACTED], #4 Exhibit 19- [REDACTED], #5 Certificate of Service)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Seal certain portions of Pacira's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of Daryl Gaugler in Support of Pacira Biosciences Inc.'s Motion to Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID S. BLOOMFIELD, JR. and KIRSTEN R. FRASER have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, ) Modified on 6/4/2021 (jc, ).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kirsten R. Fraser to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12494434.) (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David S. Bloomfield, Jr. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number BNJDC-12494355.) (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. NASIR HUSSAIN served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; BRENDAN SHEEHY served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Attempted Service as to Dr. Nasir Hussain, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Attempted Service as to Dr. Brendan Sheehy, #3 Exhibit C - Cover letters for Dr. Nasir Hussain and Dr. Brendan Sheehy that accompanied the service packages, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service via Certified Mail on Dr. Nasir Hussain, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Service via Regular Mail on Dr. Nasir Hussain, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Service via Certified Mail on Dr. Brendan Sheehy, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Service via Regular Mail on Dr. Brendan Sheehy, #8 Exhibit H - United States Postal Service tracking information)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter of 5/14/21 (ECF No. 44), asking whether Plaintiff must file a Motion to Seal and redacted versions of documents submitted under temporary seal (ECF No. 4), in support of the now withdrawn Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court is also in receipt of Defendants' respective responses (ECF Nos. 45 & 46). To the extent Plaintiff contends that sealing any such supporting documents is proper under Local Civil Rule 5.3(c), Plaintiff shall file a Motion to Seal that complies with Rule 5.3(c)(3) on or before 6/7/21. The supporting documents (ECF No. 4) shall remain temporarily sealed until the resolution of any filed Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/19/21. (jbb)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Letter from Corinne McCann Trainor to the Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J. and the Hon. Jessica S. Allen, U.S.M.J. re #45 Letter, #44 Letter. (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Jessica S. Allen, U.S.M.J. re #44 Letter. (MARINO, KEVIN)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Letter from Kevin M. McDonough regarding sealed documents. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Transcript of Zoom Case Management Conference held on May 7, 2021, before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Transcriber: KLJ Transcription Service (201-703-1670). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 6/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (wh)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD P. NORTON on behalf of MICHAEL K. ESSANDOH, NASIR HUSSAIN, BRENDAN SHEEHY, DAVID L. STAHL, TRISTAN E. WEAVER (NORTON, GERARD)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER on Consent granting #38 Pro Hac Vice Motion as to David Bloomfield, Esq. and Kirsten Fraser, Esq. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/10/2021. (ams, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/7/2021. (ams, ) Modified on 5/10/2021 (ams, ).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER: For the reasons set forth on the record during today's Case Management Conference, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 3) is withdrawn. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the Motion at ECF No. 3. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/7/21. (jbb)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Letter from Corinne McCann Trainor to the Hon. Jessica S. Allen, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Corinne McCann Trainor in Support of Pro Hac Application of David S. Bloomfield, Jr., #2 Certification of Corinne McCann Trainor in Support of Pro Hac Application of Kirsten R. Fraser, #3 Declaration of David S. Bloomfield, Jr., #4 Declaration of Kirsten R. Fraser, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(TRAINOR, CORINNE)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR on behalf of MICHAEL K. ESSANDOH, NASIR HUSSAIN, BRENDAN SHEEHY, DAVID L. STAHL, TRISTAN E. WEAVER (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR on behalf of MICHAEL K. ESSANDOH, NASIR HUSSAIN, BRENDAN SHEEHY, DAVID L. STAHL, TRISTAN E. WEAVER (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, DOMINIC F. CERRITO, KAITLIN P. SHEEHAN, MICHAEL B. CARLINSKY and ROBERT M. SCHWARTZ, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Zoom Case Management Conference held on 5/7/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder: Zoom Audio) (jbb)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert M. Schwartz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12438431.) (BOYLE, JOHN)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael B. Carlinsky to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12438423.) (BOYLE, JOHN)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kaitlin P. Sheehan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12438410.) (BOYLE, JOHN)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice F. Dominic Cerrito to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12438385.) (BOYLE, JOHN)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' Motion on Short Notice for a Case Management Conference (ECF No. 26), as well as Plaintiff's response (ECF No. 27), and Defendants' reply thereto (ECF No. 29). The Court will conduct a Case Management Conference to address same by way of Zoom Videoconference on 5/7/21 at 3:00 p.m., and will provide the parties with the connection information in advance. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/5/21. (jbb)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael B. Carlinsky, Esq., Robert M. Schwartz, Esq., F. Dominic Cerrito, Esq. and Kaitlin P. Sheehan, Esq. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/3/2021. (ams, )
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Defendants re #26 MOTION on Short Notice For A Case Management Conference (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BOYLE, JOHN)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Letter from John A. Boyle to the Honorable Jessica S. Allen, U.S.M.J. regarding application for pro hac vice admission. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John A. Boyle, #2 Certification of Michael B. Carlinsky, #3 Certification of Robert M. Schwartz, #4 Certification of Francis D. Cerrito, #5 Certification of Kaitlin P. Sheehan, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(BOYLE, JOHN)
May 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion filed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC. re #26 MOTION on Short Notice For A Case Management Conference - consenting to request for expedited treatment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email correspondence)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #26 MOTION on Short Notice For A Case Management Conference . Motion set for 6/7/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION on Short Notice For A Case Management Conference by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brief (Letter Memorandum), #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MARINO, KEVIN)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. BOYLE on behalf of All Defendants (BOYLE, JOHN)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN HARRY MARINO on behalf of All Defendants (MARINO, KEVIN)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. FARAJ W. ABDALLAH served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. BRIAN M. ILFELD served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. RODNEY A. GABRIEL served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. JAMES C. EISENACH served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. RICHARD BRULL served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. EVAN D. KHARASCH served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. MARY ELLEN McCANN served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. TRISTAN E. WEAVER served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. DAVID L. STAHL served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. MICHAEL K. ESSANDOH served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. AMERICAN SOCIETY OF ANESTHESIOLOGISTS, INC. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, ALLEN M. GARDNER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, SARAH M. GRAGERT, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Magistrate Judge James B. Clark no longer assigned to the case. (aw, )
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sarah M. Gragert to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12381985.) (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Allen M. Gardner to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12381911.) (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah M. Gragert, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/15/2021. (ams, )
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Allen M. Gardner, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/15/2021. (ams, )
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FARAJ W. ABDALLAH, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF ANESTHESIOLOGISTS, INC., RICHARD BRULL, JAMES C. EISENACH, MICHAEL K. ESSANDOH, RODNEY A. GABRIEL, NASIR HUSSAIN, BRIAN M. ILFELD, EVAN D. KHARASCH, MARY ELLEN McCANN, BRENDAN SHEEHY, DAVID L. STAHL, TRISTAN E. WEAVER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Allen M. Gardner, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sarah M. Gragert, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter from Kevin M. McDonough, requesting leave of the Court to exceed the page limit for Pacira's brief in support of its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sarah M. Gragert by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kevin M. McDonough in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Sarah M. Gragert in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Allen M. Gardner by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kevin M. McDonough in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Allen M. Gardner in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC. re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7- (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 8- (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 13- (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 19- (Filed Under Seal))(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support (Filed Under Seal), #2 Declaration of Sarah M. Gragert in Support of Plaintiff Pacira Biosciences, Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7- (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 8- (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13- (Filed Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19- (Filed Under Seal), #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Text of Proposed Order, #24 Certificate of Service)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FARAJ W. ABDALLAH, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF ANESTHESIOLOGISTS, INC., RICHARD BRULL, JAMES C. EISENACH, MICHAEL K. ESSANDOH, RODNEY A. GABRIEL, NASIR HUSSAIN, BRIAN M. ILFELD, EVAN D. KHARASCH, MARY ELLEN McCANN, BRENDAN SHEEHY, DAVID L. STAHL, TRISTAN E. WEAVER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12371348) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 11.2, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC. v. AMERICAN SOCIETY OF ANESTHESIOLOGISTS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF ANESTHESIOLOGISTS, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASIR HUSSAIN
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: GERARD P. NORTON
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Represented By: CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDAN SHEEHY
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: GERARD P. NORTON
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Represented By: CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES C. EISENACH
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY ELLEN McCANN
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID L. STAHL
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: GERARD P. NORTON
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Represented By: CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARAJ W. ABDALLAH
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRISTAN E. WEAVER
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: GERARD P. NORTON
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Represented By: CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN M. ILFELD
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY A. GABRIEL
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD BRULL
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVAN D. KHARASCH
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL K. ESSANDOH
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: GERARD P. NORTON
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Represented By: CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIRA BIOSCIENCES, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN M. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?