SIACI SAINT HONORE v. M/V SEALAND ILLINOIS et al
Plaintiff: SIACI SAINT HONORE
Defendant: WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., M/V SEALAND ILLINOIS and EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv09541
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Expeditors International of Washington.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Narinder Parmar, #2 Exhibit Delivery Order, #3 Exhibit Expeditor Terms & Conditions, #4 Brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(PARMAR, NARINDER)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE W. WRIGHT on behalf of WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by NARINDER S. PARMAR on behalf of WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. (PARMAR, NARINDER)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/14/2021. (bt, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIACI SAINT HONORE. MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. served on 5/26/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIACI SAINT HONORE. EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC. served on 5/26/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SEALAND ILLINOIS for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (bt, )
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to West End Express Co., Inc... (PARMAR, NARINDER)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Request for Default by SIACI SAINT HONORE against M/V SEALAND ILLINOIS. (Attachments: #1 Certification In Supp. of Request To Enter Default (MV SEALAND ILLINOIS))(BARROW, TIMOTHY)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIACI SAINT HONORE. WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 USM SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIACI SAINT HONORE. M/V SEALAND ILLINOIS served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (ld, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., M/V SEALAND ILLINOIS, MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIACI SAINT HONORE. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., M/V SEALAND ILLINOIS, MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12379912), filed by SIACI SAINT HONORE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BARROW, TIMOTHY)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIACI SAINT HONORE v. M/V SEALAND ILLINOIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.
Represented By: NARINDER S. PARMAR
Represented By: GEORGE W. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V SEALAND ILLINOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIACI SAINT HONORE
Represented By: TIMOTHY DONALD BARROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?