KAUL v. MURPHY et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL
Defendant: CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE, MICHAEL MURPHY, FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS, CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, AQR CAPITAL, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS, DOREEN ANNETTE HAFNER, CONNECTICUT MEDICAL BOARD, ABBOTT BROWN and ANDREW GREGORY KAUFMAN
Case Number: 2:2021cv09788
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by ABBOTT BROWN. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(CHIPKO, MICHAEL)
June 10, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), #21 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Motions set for 7/6/2021 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by MICHAEL MURPHY. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Brief)(DELAURENTIS, DOMINIC)
June 9, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by DOMINIC A. DELAURENTIS, JR on behalf of MICHAEL MURPHY (DELAURENTIS, DOMINIC)
June 4, 2021 Filing 19 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (jc, )
May 27, 2021 Filing 18 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (ld, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 17 Letter from Robert J. McGuire, DAG re #14 Letter, #9 Order,,, #8 Letter. (MCGUIRE, ROBERT)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #12 Motion an order providing that that Defendants in this matter are not obligated to plead in response to the complaint in this matter, or to file a response to any motion or other application for relief to this Court by Plaintiff, until directed to so by order of this Court, and further that Defendants are not required to engage in any Rule 26(f) conference with Plaintiff unless and until this Court issues an Order that requires Defendants to do so; that upon proper service, Defendants should respond as provided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Civil Rules; that the Clerk's Office shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff via regularand certified mail return receipt. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 5/19/2021. (ld, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 15 Letter from RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ld, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Robert J. McGuire, DAG re #9 Order,,, #6 Letter, #8 Letter. (MCGUIRE, ROBERT)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE to immediately conduct a Rule 26(f) conference in all The Kaul Cases by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ld, )
May 17, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION an order providing that that Defendants in this matter are not obligated to plead in response to the complaint in this matter, or to file a response to any motion or other application for relief to this Court by Plaintiff, until directed to so. Motion set for 6/21/2021 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION an order providing that that Defendants in this matter are not obligated to plead in response to the complaint in this matter, or to file a response to any motion or other application for relief to this Court by Plaintiff, until directed to so by order of this Court, and further that Defendants are not required to engage in any Rule 26(f) conference with Plaintiff unless and until this Court issues an Order that requires Defendants to do so by CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, DOREEN ANNETTE HAFNER, ANDREW GREGORY KAUFMAN, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Robert J. McGuire, DAG)(MCGUIRE, ROBERT)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 Letter. (CHIPKO, MICHAEL)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. CHIPKO on behalf of ABBOTT BROWN (CHIPKO, MICHAEL)
May 12, 2021 USPS Certified Mail Tracking No. 7018 1830 0000 9606 0665 for #9 Order (jc, )
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that any discovery requests Plaintiff has served or attempted to serve in this matter are STRICKEN, QUASHED, and/or INVALID and that Plaintiff may not serve or attempt to serve any discovery in this matter without leave of this Court. Plaintiff and/or his agents are precluded from directly communicating, or attempting to directly communicate, with any represented Defendants or their relatives, and from entering the property where any represented Defendant resides. If Plaintiff wishes to contact any represented Defendant, he must do so through that Defendant's counsel. As with all Court Orders, if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, he may face sanctions, contempt, and/or other appropriate action by the Court, etc. (Copy of Order sent to Plaintiff by certified mail return receipt and reg mail). Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 5/12/21. (jc, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Robert J. McGuire, DAG re #6 Letter. (MCGUIRE, ROBERT)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Robert J. McGuire, DAG. (MCGUIRE, ROBERT)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. MCGUIRE on behalf of NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS (MCGUIRE, ROBERT)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from RICHARD ARJUN KAUL. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ld, ) (mfr).
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. MCGUIRE on behalf of CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, DOREEN ANNETTE HAFNER, ANDREW GREGORY KAUFMAN (MCGUIRE, ROBERT)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, AQR CAPITAL, ABBOTT BROWN, CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE, CONNECTICUT MEDICAL BOARD, FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS, DOREEN ANNETTE HAFNER, ANDREW GREGORY KAUFMAN, MICHAEL MURPHY, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
May 4, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number NEW044594 (ld, )
May 4, 2021 COMPLAINT see document #1 against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, AQR CAPITAL, ABBOTT BROWN, CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE, CONNECTICUT MEDICAL BOARD, FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS, DOREEN ANNETTE HAFNER, ANDREW GREGORY KAUFMAN, MICHAEL MURPHY, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number NEW044594), filed by RICHARD ARJUN KAUL.(ld, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (jc, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint Received. No filing fee or IFP Application received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAUL v. MURPHY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MURPHY
Represented By: DOMINIC A. DELAURENTIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERATION OF STATE MEDICAL BOARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQR CAPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOREEN ANNETTE HAFNER
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNECTICUT MEDICAL BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT BROWN
Represented By: MICHAEL P. CHIPKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW GREGORY KAUFMAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?