PITTMAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: EDWARD PITTMAN
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: WILLIAM F. KAETZ
Case Number: 2:2021cv10123
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Set Deadlines as to 4 MOTION for Intervention. Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Intervention by WILLIAM F. KAETZ. (jc, )
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff's #1 -1 Application IFP is GRANTED, etc.; Plaintiff's civil rights claims against the United States are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (n/m). Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/2/2021. (ams, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/2/2021. (ams, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Envelope)(ams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PITTMAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WILLIAM F. KAETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?