GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. FANO et al
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO. and GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: M.D. DELYS ST. HILL, M.D. RAVI PATEL, M.D. CYRUS KAO, UNION MEDICAL, L.L.C., D.C. VICTOR FANO, M.D. DURGESH MANKIKAR, M.D. ANAMIKA JAIN, ANAMIKA JAIN, CYRUS KAO, DURGESH MANKIKAR, DELYS ST. HILL and RAVI PATEL
Case Number: 2:2021cv10433
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION and Acknowledgement of Service as to Defendant Cyrus Kao, M.D. by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KANG, GENE)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by VICTOR FANO, DELYS ST. HILL, UNION MEDICAL, L.L.C.. (PEARLSON, A.)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Steven Henesy, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/15/2021. (ams, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendants Union Medical, L.L.C., Victor Fano, D.C. and Delys St. Hill, M.D. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through and including 6/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/15/2021. (ams, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from A.Ross Pearlson, Esq. to Hon. Michael A.Hammer re:stipulation to extend Defendants time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint.. (PEARLSON, A.)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Steven Henesy by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu Brief Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 7.1(d)(4), #2 Certification of Gene Y. Kang, #3 Certification of Barry I. Levy, #4 Certification of Max Gershenoff, #5 Certification of Steven Henesy, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
June 14, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Steven Henesy. Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendants Union Medical, L.L.C., Victor Fano, D.C. and Delys St. Hill, M.D. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended through and including 6/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/10/2021. (ams, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. VICTOR FANO served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021; UNION MEDICAL, L.L.C. served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Union Medical, L.L.C., #2 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from A.Ross Pearlson, Esq. to Hon. Michael A. Hammer re: stipulation to extend Defendants time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint.. (PEARLSON, A.)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNY CHUNG on behalf of VICTOR FANO, DELYS ST. HILL, UNION MEDICAL, L.L.C. (CHUNG, JENNY)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by A. ROSS PEARLSON on behalf of VICTOR FANO, DELYS ST. HILL, UNION MEDICAL, L.L.C. (PEARLSON, A.)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to VICTOR FANO, ANAMIKA JAIN, CYRUS KAO, DURGESH MANKIKAR, RAVI PATEL, DELYS ST. HILL, UNION MEDICAL, L.L.C. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
April 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KANG, GENE)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VICTOR FANO, ANAMIKA JAIN, CYRUS KAO, DURGESH MANKIKAR, RAVI PATEL, DELYS ST. HILL, UNION MEDICAL, L.L.C. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12420847) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KANG, GENE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. FANO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. DELYS ST. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. RAVI PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. CYRUS KAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION MEDICAL, L.L.C.
Represented By: JENNY CHUNG
Represented By: A. ROSS PEARLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. VICTOR FANO
Represented By: JENNY CHUNG
Represented By: A. ROSS PEARLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. DURGESH MANKIKAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. ANAMIKA JAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANAMIKA JAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYRUS KAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURGESH MANKIKAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELYS ST. HILL
Represented By: JENNY CHUNG
Represented By: A. ROSS PEARLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAVI PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?