1199 SEIU v. CRANFORD REHAB AND NURSING CENTER et al
Plaintiff: 1199 SEIU
Defendant: Rehab at River's Edge, Cranford Rehab and Nursing and CRANFORD REHAB AND NURSING CENTER
Case Number: 2:2021cv10472
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRANFORD REHAB AND NURSING CENTER, REHAB AT RIVER'S EDGE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The court having been advised arbitration was held on April 30, 2021, and an arbitration award was entered enjoining the sale, the emergency applications (ECF Nos. #2 & #3 ) are administratively terminated as moot. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 05/03/2021. (lr, )
April 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause by 1199 SEIU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine Hansen In Support of Emergency Application for Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit A to Hansen Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Hansen Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Hansen Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Hansen Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Hansen Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Hansen Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Hansen Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Hansen Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Hansen Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Hansen Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Hansen Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Hansen Declaration)(HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by 1199 SEIU. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12423023), filed by 1199 SEIU.(HANSEN, KATHERINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1199 SEIU v. CRANFORD REHAB AND NURSING CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehab at River's Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cranford Rehab and Nursing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANFORD REHAB AND NURSING CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1199 SEIU
Represented By: KATHERINE H. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?