INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION v. UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE et al
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION
Defendant: ORIENT OVERSEAS CONTAINER LINE, UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE, HAPAG-LLOYD A.G., OVERSEAS CONTAINER LINE, LTD and UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE, LTD
Case Number: 2:2021cv10740
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER: This action and any pending Motions are ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/1/2021. (ams, )
June 1, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 6/1/2021. (seb)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition filed by UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE, LTD re #5 MOTION to Stay Civil Action Pending Resolution of NLRB Hearing (Attachments: #1 Certification of James R. Campbell, #2 Exhibit A to Campbell Certification)(CAMPBELL, JAMES)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER: The Court will conduct a telephone conference with the parties in this matter on 6/1/2021 at 11:30 AM etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/20/2021. (bt, )
May 20, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/21/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cds)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (SHERIDAN, JOHN)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE, LTD re #4 Certification Regarding Notice of Removal (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
May 14, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #5 MOTION to Stay Civil Action Pending Resolution of NLRB Hearing. Motion set for 6/7/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE, LTD. Responses due by 5/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of David F. Adam, #3 Certification of James R. Campbell, #4 Exhibit A to the Campbell Certification, #5 Exhibit B to the Campbell Certification, #6 Exhibit C to the Campbell Certification, #7 Exhibit D to the Campbell Certification, #8 Exhibit E to the Campbell Certification, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, JAMES)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Civil Action Pending Resolution of NLRB Hearing by INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION. (SHERIDAN, JOHN)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 Certification on behalf of UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE Re #1 Notice of Removal,. (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE re #1 Notice of Removal, (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE from Superior Court of NJ, Essex County, case number ESX L 0032321 21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12438305), filed by UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Master Contract, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(CAMPBELL, JAMES)
May 5, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION v. UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORIENT OVERSEAS CONTAINER LINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE
Represented By: JAMES R. CAMPBELL, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAPAG-LLOYD A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OVERSEAS CONTAINER LINE, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES MARITIME ALLIANCE, LTD
Represented By: JAMES R. CAMPBELL, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION
Represented By: MICHAEL D. CRITCHLEY
Represented By: JOHN PHILIP SHERIDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?