WIZARD TECH SOLUTIONS INC. v. WALSH et al
Plaintiff: WIZARD TECH SOLUTIONS INC.
Defendant: MARTIN J. WALSH, ATLANTA NATIONAL PROCESSING CENTER, BRIAN D. PASTERNAK, EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING ADMINISTRATION, BRANDT CARTER, DEPARTMENT OF LABOR and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Case Number: 2:2021cv11089
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA JUNEAU on behalf of ATLANTA NATIONAL PROCESSING CENTER, BRANDT CARTER, EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING ADMINISTRATION, BRIAN D. PASTERNAK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, MARTIN J. WALSH (JUNEAU, ANGELA)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WIZARD TECH SOLUTIONS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KOZAR, MIKA)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WIZARD TECH SOLUTIONS INC.. ATLANTA NATIONAL PROCESSING CENTER served on 5/26/2021, answer due 6/16/2021; BRANDT CARTER served on 5/26/2021, answer due 6/16/2021; EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING ADMINISTRATION served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021; BRIAN D. PASTERNAK served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; MARTIN J. WALSH served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service)(KOZAR, MIKA)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATLANTA NATIONAL PROCESSING CENTER, BRANDT CARTER, EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING ADMINISTRATION, BRIAN D. PASTERNAK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, MARTIN J. WALSH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
May 12, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption, Party Information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jc, )
May 11, 2021 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WIZARD TECH SOLUTIONS INC.. (KOZAR, MIKA)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATLANTA NATIONAL PROCESSING CENTER, BRANDT CARTER, DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING ADMINISTRATION, BRIAN D. PASTERNAK, MARTIN J. WALSH ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12454349), filed by WIZARD TECH SOLUTIONS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (PERM Application), #3 Exhibit 2 (Audit Response), #4 Exhibit 3 (Denial of PERM Application), #5 Summons (Martin J. Walsh), #6 Summons (Brian D. Pasternak), #7 Summons (Brandt Carter), #8 Summons (US DOL), #9 Summons (Employment and Training Administration), #10 Summons (Atlanta National Processing Center), #11 Summons (Attorney General for United States), #12 Summons (US Attorney for NJ))(KOZAR, MIKA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WIZARD TECH SOLUTIONS INC. v. WALSH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN J. WALSH
Represented By: ANGELA JUNEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTA NATIONAL PROCESSING CENTER
Represented By: ANGELA JUNEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN D. PASTERNAK
Represented By: ANGELA JUNEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: ANGELA JUNEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDT CARTER
Represented By: ANGELA JUNEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: ANGELA JUNEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WIZARD TECH SOLUTIONS INC.
Represented By: MIKA BROOKS KOZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?