SIACI SAINT HONORE v. M/V BILBAO BRIDGE et al
Plaintiff: SIACI SAINT HONORE
Defendant: WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC., EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., M/V BILBAO BRIDGE, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. and OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. doing business as ONE
Case Number: 2:2021cv11254
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter from Thomas C. Martin, Esq.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS C. MARTIN on behalf of EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter from Narinder S. Parmar. (PARMAR, NARINDER)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 7/19/2021 Replies due by 7/26/2021. Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (gh, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by SIACI SAINT HONORE re #8 MOTION to Dismiss By Defendant WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Narinder Parmar, #2 Exhibit A Delivery Order, #3 Exhibit Expeditor Terms & Conditions, #4 Brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(PARMAR, NARINDER)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE W. WRIGHT on behalf of WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by NARINDER S. PARMAR on behalf of WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. (PARMAR, NARINDER)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Application to extend time to answer as to West End Express Co., Inc., document #5 submitted by WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/28/2021. (JB, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to West End Express Co., Inc... (PARMAR, NARINDER)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIACI SAINT HONORE. WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., M/V BILBAO BRIDGE, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIACI SAINT HONORE. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., M/V BILBAO BRIDGE, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12465442), filed by SIACI SAINT HONORE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BARROW, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIACI SAINT HONORE v. M/V BILBAO BRIDGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIACI SAINT HONORE
Represented By: TIMOTHY DONALD BARROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.
Represented By: GEORGE W. WRIGHT
Represented By: NARINDER S. PARMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V BILBAO BRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD. doing business as ONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?