MUHAMMAD v. CIRILO et al
Plaintiff: ALIF MUHAMMAD
Defendant: CITY OF NEWARK, NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY, NORMA GONZALEZ, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION DEPARTMENT, JOHN DOE 1-5, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, FAUSTO BAEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, VICTOR CIRILO and ABC CORP 1-5
Case Number: 2:2021cv11267
Filed: May 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 17 Letter to Judge Allen from ALIF MUHAMMAD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Superior Court Cert in Opposition to Motion to Seal, #3 Envelope)(ld, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Seal, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/10/2021. (ams, )
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), without prejudice. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/3/2021. (ld, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ALIF MUHAMMAD (ld, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 Letter to Judge Arleo from ALIF MUHAMMAD. (ld, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Notice of Removal, #7 Certification,, by NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #4 Appendix, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(ADAMS, CHRISTOPHER)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 REDACTION to #1 Notice of Removal, by NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY. (MURPHY, THOMAS)
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 Certification of of Service by Thomas K. Murphy III on behalf of NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY Re #8 Order to Show Cause, 9 Order. (MURPHY, THOMAS)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER, defense counsel is hereby directed to serve a copy of the Order at ecf-8 upon the plaintiff via federal express delivery. A certificate of service shall be filed with the Court. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 5/28/21. (aa, )
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER: Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the #6 Application for Entry of an Order to Show Cause by 6/2/2021; Oral argument via Zoom shall be held on 6/3/2021 at 12:30 PM (n/m). Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 5/28/2021. (ams, )
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 Certification on behalf of NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY Re #6 Proposed Pretrial Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G (Unredacted) Confidential)(ADAMS, CHRISTOPHER)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Order seeking Emergent Relief and Temporary Restraints by NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Thomas K Murphy III, #3 Exhibit A-G (Redacted), #4 Certificate of Service)(ADAMS, CHRISTOPHER)
May 27, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FAUSTO BAEZ, VICTOR CIRILO, NORMA GONZALEZ, NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/17/2021. (ld, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Newark Housing Authority, Victor Cirilo, Fauto Baez and Norma Gonzalez.. (MURPHY, THOMAS)
May 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS KILEY MURPHY, III on behalf of FAUSTO BAEZ, VICTOR CIRILO, NORMA GONZALEZ, NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY (MURPHY, THOMAS)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER D. ADAMS on behalf of FAUSTO BAEZ, VICTOR CIRILO, NORMA GONZALEZ, NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY (ADAMS, CHRISTOPHER)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by VICTOR A. AFANADOR on behalf of CITY OF NEWARK (AFANADOR, VICTOR)
May 16, 2021 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps)
May 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number ESX-L-3681-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12465747), filed by NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed NJ Superior Court Complaint)(ADAMS, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MUHAMMAD v. CIRILO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEWARK
Represented By: VICTOR A. AFANADOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D. ADAMS
Represented By: THOMAS KILEY MURPHY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMA GONZALEZ
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D. ADAMS
Represented By: THOMAS KILEY MURPHY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAUSTO BAEZ
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D. ADAMS
Represented By: THOMAS KILEY MURPHY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR CIRILO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D. ADAMS
Represented By: THOMAS KILEY MURPHY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALIF MUHAMMAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?