BELL et al v. DAVE et al
Plaintiff: GABRIELLA BELL, LAD JOSEPH BELL, HERMOINE KING and JILL JONES
Defendant: GEORGE THOMAS DAVE and GT'S LIVING FOODS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv11816
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on November 9, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/28/2021. (sms)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY IRA KOHN on behalf of GEORGE THOMAS DAVE, GT'S LIVING FOODS, LLC (KOHN, JEFFREY)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LAD JOSEPH BELL, HERMOINE KING, JILL JONES, GABRIELLA BELL. GT'S LIVING FOODS, LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (KEATING, CHRISTOPHER)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LAD JOSEPH BELL, HERMOINE KING, JILL JONES, GABRIELLA BELL. GEORGE THOMAS DAVE waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (KEATING, CHRISTOPHER)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER JOHN KEATING on behalf of GABRIELLA BELL, LAD JOSEPH BELL, JILL JONES, HERMOINE KING (KEATING, CHRISTOPHER)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN PETER RODDY on behalf of GABRIELLA BELL, LAD JOSEPH BELL, JILL JONES, HERMOINE KING (RODDY, KEVIN)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GEORGE THOMAS DAVE, GT'S LIVING FOODS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
May 27, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEORGE THOMAS DAVE, GT'S LIVING FOODS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12498725) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LAD JOSEPH BELL, HERMOINE KING, JILL JONES, GABRIELLA BELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS)(KEEFE, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL et al v. DAVE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIELLA BELL
Represented By: JOHN E. KEEFE, JR.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JOHN KEATING
Represented By: KEVIN PETER RODDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAD JOSEPH BELL
Represented By: JOHN E. KEEFE, JR.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JOHN KEATING
Represented By: KEVIN PETER RODDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERMOINE KING
Represented By: JOHN E. KEEFE, JR.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JOHN KEATING
Represented By: KEVIN PETER RODDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JILL JONES
Represented By: JOHN E. KEEFE, JR.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JOHN KEATING
Represented By: KEVIN PETER RODDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE THOMAS DAVE
Represented By: JEFFREY IRA KOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GT'S LIVING FOODS, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY IRA KOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?