Coombs v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Adrean Coombs
Defendant: CFG MEDICAL SERVICES, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERV., U.S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Dist Court, Southern District of NY, ANDREW CUOMO, GUY CIRELLO, COUNTY OF ESSEX, NJ, COLLEEN MCMAHON, Asst. Admin. ALFARO ORTIZ, PHIL MURPHY and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2021cv12131
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sm)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 4) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate this case, without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee; Plaintiff is informed that administrative termination is not a dismissal for purposes of the statute of limitations; the Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff a blank form application to proceed in forma pauperis; etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/7/2021. (sm)
June 4, 2021 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-03761. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 28, 2021 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case to the Superintendent of Essex County Correctional Facility at 354 Doremus Ave, Newark, NJ 07105. (kh)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/27/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PARTIAL TRANSFER ORDER: The Court severs Plaintiff's claims that arose in New Jersey and are asserted against Defendants County of Essex, New Jersey; ECCF Warden Guy Cirello; ECCF Director Alfaro Ortiz; CFG Medical Services; New Jersey Governor Phil Murphy; and the United States Marshals Service in Trenton, New Jersey, and transfers the claims against these defendants to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees in the action encompassing such claims is a determination to be made by the transferee court. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/27/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
May 27, 2021 Mailed a copy of #5 Order, to Adrean Coombs at Essex County Correctional Facility, 354 Doremus Ave, Newark, NJ 07105. (dsh)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Adrean Coombs. (nb)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Adrean Coombs..(nb)
May 4, 2021 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization, to Adrean Coombs at Essex County Correctional Facility, 354 Doremus Ave, Newark, NJ 07105. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application, # 2 prisoner authorization) (dsh)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 6/2/2021. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 6/2/2021. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 6/2/2021. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/3/2021) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 prisoner authorization) (keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
April 29, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CFG Medical Services, Guy Cirello, County of Essex, NJ, Andrew Cuomo, Colleen McMahon, Phil Murphy, Alfaro Ortiz, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Dist Court, Southern District of NY, United States Marshals Serv., United States of America. Document filed by Adrean Coombs. (sac)
April 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coombs v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFG MEDICAL SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERV.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dist Court, Southern District of NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW CUOMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUY CIRELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF ESSEX, NJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLEEN MCMAHON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asst. Admin. ALFARO ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHIL MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrean Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?