MAGSIG v. START MOVING INC. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MAGSIG
Defendant: START MOVING INC. D/B/A KEIRA MOVING, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, THE SAME BEING FICTITIOUS PARTIES and START MOVING INC. doing business as KEIRA MOVING
Case Number: 2:2021cv12135
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, MICHAEL MAGSIG by START MOVING INC..(DOOLEY, TERESA)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss, re #13 Letter request, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 7/9/2021. (lag, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Teresa H. Dooley re #13 Letter. (DOOLEY, TERESA)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Michael C. Klauder, Esq. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Notice of Motion to Dismiss. (KLAUDER, MICHAEL)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, THE SAME BEING FICTITIOUS PARTIES, JOHN DOES 1-10, START MOVING INC., filed by MICHAEL MAGSIG.(KLAUDER, MICHAEL)
June 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Notice of Motion to Dismiss. Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Michael C. Klauder, Esq. requesting a one-cycle adjournment of the Motion to Dismiss to July 19, 2021 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Notice of Motion to Dismiss. (KLAUDER, MICHAEL)
June 14, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Notice of Motion to Dismiss. Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Teresa H. Dooley re #8 Order,, Set Hearings,, Set/Clear Flags,. (DOOLEY, TERESA)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Teresa H. Dooley re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Notice of Motion to Dismiss, #5 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Notice of Motion to Dismiss. (DOOLEY, TERESA)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER - A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/11/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. At the allotted time, counsel shall dial (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/11/2021. (kd)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Notice of Motion to Dismiss by START MOVING INC.. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Teresa H. Dooley, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A-ICU Investigations, Inc. v. Simonik Moving & Storage, Inc., #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B-Overseas Lease Group, Inc. v. Plocher Construction Co., Inc., #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #5 Brief Memorandum of Law)(DOOLEY, TERESA)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Notice of Motion to Dismiss by START MOVING INC.. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Teresa H. Dooley, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A-ICU Investigations, Inc. v. Simonik Moving & Storage, Inc., #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B-Overseas Lease Group, Inc. v. Plocher Construction Co., Inc., #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #5 Brief Memorandum of Law)(DOOLEY, TERESA)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Notice of Motion to Dismiss by START MOVING INC.. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Teresa H. Dooley, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A-ICU Investigations, Inc. v. Simonik Moving & Storage, Inc., #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B-Overseas Lease Group, Inc. v. Plocher Construction Co., Inc., #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DOOLEY, TERESA)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by START MOVING INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (DOOLEY, TERESA)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY PARK on behalf of MICHAEL MAGSIG (PARK, EMILY)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by START MOVING INC.. (DOOLEY, TERESA)
June 7, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (lag, )
June 4, 2021 Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by START MOVING INC. D/B/A KEIRA MOVING from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number MID-L-002440-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12519078), filed by START MOVING INC. D/B/A KEIRA MOVING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(DOOLEY, TERESA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAGSIG v. START MOVING INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: START MOVING INC. D/B/A KEIRA MOVING
Represented By: TERESA HANSAEM DOOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, THE SAME BEING FICTITIOUS PARTIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: START MOVING INC. doing business as KEIRA MOVING
Represented By: TERESA HANSAEM DOOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MAGSIG
Represented By: MICHAEL C. KLAUDER
Represented By: EMILY PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?