GREENWALD ASSOCIATES LLC v. HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF NEWARK et al
Plaintiff: GREENWALD ASSOCIATES LLC
Defendant: BRIAN K. LOGAN, NORMA GONZALEZ, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF NEWARK d/b/a NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY, FAUSTO BAEZ, DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, EDWARD OSBORNE, ALIF MUHAMMAD, MORRIS WARNER, MARTINIQUE W. COSTA, VICTOR CIRILO, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF NEWARK doing business as NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Case Number: 2:2021cv12136
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 Exhibit to QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, by GREENWALD ASSOCIATES LLC. (WOLF, MARTIN)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FAUSTO BAEZ, VICTOR CIRILO, MARTINIQUE W. COSTA, NORMA GONZALEZ, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF NEWARK, BRIAN K. LOGAN, ALIF MUHAMMAD, EDWARD OSBORNE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT, MORRIS WARNER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
June 22, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ams, )
June 4, 2021 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FAUSTO BAEZ, VICTOR CIRILO, MARTINIQUE W. COSTA, DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, NORMA GONZALEZ, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF NEWARK d/b/a NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY, BRIAN K. LOGAN, ALIF MUHAMMAD, EDWARD OSBORNE, MORRIS WARNER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12519268) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GREENWALD ASSOCIATES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Contract, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Resolution, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Addendum to Contract, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Letter Dated 4/16/19, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Letter Dated July 26, 2019, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Letter Dated 12/16/19, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Reinstatement Letter 8/27/20, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Reinstatement Agreement, #9 Summons Summons - NHA, #10 Summons Summons - HUD, #11 Summons Summons - Logan, #12 Summons Summons - Baez, #13 Summons Summons - Costa, #14 Summons Summons - Gonzalez, #15 Summons Summons - Warner, #16 Summons Summons - Cirillo, #17 Summons Summons - Muhammad, #18 Summons Summons - Osborne)(WOLF, MARTIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENWALD ASSOCIATES LLC v. HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF NEWARK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN K. LOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMA GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF NEWARK d/b/a NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAUSTO BAEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD OSBORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALIF MUHAMMAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRIS WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTINIQUE W. COSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR CIRILO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF NEWARK doing business as NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREENWALD ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By: MARTIN WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?