SIACI SAINT HONORE v. MV BERLIN BRIDGE et al
Plaintiff: SIACI SAINT HONORE
Defendant: WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC., MV BERLIN BRIDGE, EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC. and OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD.
Case Number: 2:2021cv12285
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS ISSUED on Amended Verified Complaint as to EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., MV BERLIN BRIDGE, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Request for Summons to be Issued by SIACI SAINT HONORE as to EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., MV BERLIN BRIDGE, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by SIACI SAINT HONORE as to EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., MV BERLIN BRIDGE, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Amended Verified Complaint In Admiralty) against EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., MV BERLIN BRIDGE, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC., filed by SIACI SAINT HONORE.(BARROW, TIMOTHY)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The matter is STAYED pending the disposition of the Motions to Consolidate and Transfer venues in 21-cv-1460, ECF Nos. 29, 31, and 32.. So Ordered by Judge William J. Martini on 7/15/21. (gh, )
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from Thomas C. Martin, Esq.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS C. MARTIN on behalf of EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter from Narinder S. Parmar. (PARMAR, NARINDER)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE W. WRIGHT on behalf of WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by NARINDER S. PARMAR on behalf of WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. (PARMAR, NARINDER)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by NARINDER S. PARMAR on behalf of WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. (PARMAR, NARINDER)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark for all further proceedings. Judge Susan D. Wigenton, Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 06/21/21. (aw, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., MV BERLIN BRIDGE, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter from Timothy D. Barrow - Counsel For Plaintiff to Clerk of Court, U.S.D.C - D.NJ- Newark dated June 9, 2021 re Related Cases. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIACI SAINT HONORE. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., MV BERLIN BRIDGE, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD., WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12531152), filed by SIACI SAINT HONORE.(BARROW, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIACI SAINT HONORE v. MV BERLIN BRIDGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST END EXPRESS CO., INC.
Represented By: GEORGE W. WRIGHT
Represented By: NARINDER S. PARMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV BERLIN BRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIACI SAINT HONORE
Represented By: TIMOTHY DONALD BARROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?